Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2223906

EP2223906 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINE-CONTAINING OLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2010/35]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiro
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
02 / NOSE, Masatoshi
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
03 / CHAKI, Takehiro
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
 [2014/31]
Former [2010/35]01 / TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiro
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
02 / NOSE, Masatoshi
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
03 / CHAKI, Takehiro
c/o Yodogawa Plant of DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/35]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08852480.611.11.2008
[2010/35]
WO2008JP70467
Priority number, dateJP2007030154221.11.2007         Original published format: JP 2007301542
[2010/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009066580
Date:28.05.2009
Language:JA
[2009/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2223906
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2223906
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/25, C07C21/18, C07B61/00, C07B39/00
[2014/07]
Former International [2010/35]C07C17/25, C07C21/18, C07B61/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORHALTIGEN OLEFINEN[2010/35]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINE-CONTAINING OLEFIN[2010/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE OLÉFINE CONTENANT DU FLUOR[2010/35]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2010Translation filed 
15.06.2010National basic fee paid 
15.06.2010Search fee paid 
15.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/35]
30.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2013Observations by third parties
15.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2014Fee for grant paid
12.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  13.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2017/01]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  13.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30 rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2015/25]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2015  13.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.11.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition24.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2541/16
13.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.11.2008
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IE11.11.2014
LU11.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.11.2008
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IE11.11.2014
LU11.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IE11.11.2014
LU11.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IE11.11.2014
LU11.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/33]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LU11.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/32]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LU11.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/30]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LU11.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0974571  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US] ATOFINA CHEM INC [US]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0005] * * example 1 *;
 [A]US2007100175  (MILLER RALPH N [US] ET AL MILLER RALPH NEWTON [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0033] * * examples 1,2 *
International search[X]WO9325510  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al)
ExaminationEP1110936
 US2007179324
 WO2008040969
by applicantJP3158440B
 US2007179324
 WO2007056194
 JP3412165B
 JP2000034237
otherEP1110936
 US2007179324
 WO2008040969