Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2227435

EP2227435 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AMMONIA SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASALE SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2016/21]
Former [2010/37]For all designated states
Ammonia Casale S.A.
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FILIPPI, Ermanno
Strada di Gandria 73
CH-6976 Castagnola / CH
02 / BADANO, Marco
Via Leonardo da Vinci, 8
I - 22100 COMO / IT
03 / SKINNER, Geoffrey Frederick
Kimblewick
Sutherland Av.
RG2 7AS Reading Berkshire / GB
 [2011/36]
Former [2010/37]01 / FILIPPI, Ermanno
Strada di Gandria 73
CH-6976 Castagnola / CH
02 / BADANO, Marco
c/o Ammonia Casale SA Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
CH-6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
03 / SKINNER, Geoffrey Frederick
Kimblewick Sutherland Av.
RG2 7AS Reading Berkshire / GB
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Former [2010/37]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date08853299.906.11.2008
[2010/37]
WO2008EP09341
Priority number, dateEP2007002298427.11.2007         Original published format: EP 07022984
[2010/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009068159
Date:04.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2227435
Date:15.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009
[2010/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2227435
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/02, C01B3/38, C01B3/48, C01C1/04
[2016/22]
Former International [2010/37]C01B3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMMONIAKSYNTHESEGAS[2010/37]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AMMONIA SYNTHESIS GAS[2010/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'AMMONIAC DE SYNTHÈSE[2010/37]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2010National basic fee paid 
11.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/37]
13.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2012Fee for grant paid
02.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.08.2013  10.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger, Helga
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/36]
Opponent(s)01  30.08.2013  10.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger, Helga
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  30.08.2013  10.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger, Helga
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  30.08.2013  10.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH
Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15
44141 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger, Helga
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2013/41]
Opponent(s)01  30.07.2013   
ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH
Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15
44141 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Ackermann, Joachim
Postfach 11 13 26
60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE
08.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1880/16
20.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1880/16
13.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.11.2008
AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
MT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE06.11.2013
LU06.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU06.11.2008
AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE06.11.2013
LU06.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/32]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE06.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE06.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
HR02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
NO02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
NO02.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI02.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB1270756  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * page 1 - page 2 * * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [XY]EP0770578  (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-12 * abstract * * page 1 - page 4; tables 1,2 * * claims 1,5,9 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3;
 [A]EP1698588  (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0009] , [1015] , [0023] , [0024] *;
 [A]US4296085  (BANQUY DAVID L) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * columns 1-5 * * column 8, lines 1-31 * * column 9, lines 22-30 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2671338  (GNI [SU]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 15 *