Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2227435


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.01.2020 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.08.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
09.12.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
21.10.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
17.08.2016 Change: Appeal number
17.08.2016 New entry: Appeal number
17.08.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.08.2016 New entry: Appeal number
12.08.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
12.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Change - applicant published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
22.04.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
29.10.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
05.09.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
11.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
04.07.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
21.05.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.03.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
08.11.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
06.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
06.09.2013 Opposition filed published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
30.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
16.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
02.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
24.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2013  [2013/26]
30.11.2012 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.2013  [2013/01]
27.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.11.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.11.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.08.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.01.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2011 First examination report
31.08.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.08.2011 Change - inventor published on  07.09.2011  [2011/36]
28.01.2011 Change - extension states published on  02.03.2011  [2011/09]
01.12.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.08.2010 Amendment by applicant
13.08.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.09.2010  [2010/37]
13.08.2010 Request for examination filed published on  15.09.2010  [2010/37]
26.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication