Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2225731

EP2225731 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED OPTICAL MODELING OF GEMSTONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ideal-Scope Pty. Ltd.
110-114 Canterbury Road
Canterbury, Victoria 3126 / AU
[2010/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SIVOVOLENKO, Sergey Borisovich
Hermiankatu 8D
FI-33720 Tampere / FI
 [2010/36]
Representative(s)D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/36]D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date08853731.106.10.2008
[2010/36]
WO2008EP63307
Priority number, dateAU2007090646927.11.2007         Original published format: AU 2007906469
[2010/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009068354
Date:04.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2225731
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2225731
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06T17/20, G01N21/87
[2010/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERTEN OPTISCHEN MODELLIERUNG VON EDELSTEINEN[2010/36]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED OPTICAL MODELING OF GEMSTONES[2010/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE MODÉLISATION OPTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE DE PIERRES PRÉCIEUSES[2010/36]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2010National basic fee paid 
22.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/36]
12.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2010Fee for grant paid
27.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.12.2011   
Sarin Technologies Ltd.
7 Atir Yeda
44643 Kfar Saba / IL
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/06]
Opponent(s)01  29.12.2011   
Sarin Technologies Ltd.
7 Atir Yeda
44643 Kfar Saba / IL
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
07.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.08.2013Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.10.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.10.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/48]
Appeal following opposition31.12.2013Appeal received No.  T0062/14
28.02.2014Statement of grounds filed
03.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NL01.11.2015
FR02.11.2015
DE03.05.2016
[2016/40]
Former [2016/36]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
FR02.11.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/33]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
DE03.05.2016
Former [2013/45]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/44]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2013/29]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
PL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
IE06.10.2011
LU06.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2012/10]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/50]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/49]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/47]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/38]AT30.03.2011
CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/37]CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
NO30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/36]HR30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006062446  (PORAT ZVI [IL]) [Y] 1-10,12-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] *;
 [Y]WO2005048764  (DIAMSCAN N V [BE], et al) [Y] 1-10,12-27 * abstract * * page 13, line 13 - page 15, line 27 *;
 [Y]GB2406252  (CANON EUROPA NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10,12-27 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5966673  (SHANNON SR PAUL T [US]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 22 * * column 5, line 10 - line 53 * * column 7, line 1 - line 6 * * column 8, line 28 - line 45 * * column 8, line 56 - line 64 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 12 * * column 10, line 47 - line 53 * * column 21, line 57 - column 22, line 2 *;
 [AP]US2008231833  (SHLEZINGER HAIM [IL], et al) [AP] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0344] - paragraph [0360] *
by applicantWO2005048764
 US6239867
 GB2081439
 EP1211503
 WO2007023444