Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2232418

EP2232418 - ACTIVE TAG-BASED DISPENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CareFusion 303, Inc.
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / GODLEWSKI, Peter, Phillip
4 Via Jazmin
San Clemente CA 92672 / US
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/39]Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date08853918.424.11.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US84582
Priority number, dateUS2007094669828.11.2007         Original published format: US 946698
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009070545
Date:04.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2232418
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009
[2010/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, A47B67/00, G06F19/00
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:AKTIVES AUF ETIKETTEN BASIERENDES SPENDEN[2010/39]
English:ACTIVE TAG-BASED DISPENSING[2010/39]
French:DISTRIBUTION BASÉE SUR UNE ÉTIQUETTE ACTIVE[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2010National basic fee paid 
25.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
26.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination18.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2192/15
09.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
20.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003144926  (BODIN WILLIAM KRESS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] , [0043] , [0051] , [0054] , [0058] *;
 [X]US6903656  (LEE DONNY V [US]) [X] 1-28 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 27 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 3 *;
 [X]EP1793326  (VUE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0077] , [0119] , [0121] , [0122] , [0130] , [0141] , [0220] , [0223] *;
 [A]US2007138272  (SAPERSTEIN JAN R [US] ET AL) [A] 3-6,24-28 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] *;
 [A]US2007268138  (CHUNG KEVIN K [US] ET AL) [A] 3-6,24-28 * paragraphs [0238] - [0246] *;
 [A]US2005231365  (TESTER THEODORE R [US] ET AL) [A] 3-6,24-28 * paragraphs [0141] - [0143]; figure 12 *;
 [A]US2005171738  (KADABA NAGESH [US]) [A] 12-15,20,21 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0041] *