Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2211901

EP2211901 - VACCINATION WITH MULTIPLE CLADES OF H5 INFLUENZA A VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seqirus UK Limited
Point
Level 3, 29 Market Street
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 8AA / GB
[2017/51]
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PODDA, Audino
Novartis Vaccines
Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
02 / RAPPUOLI, Rino
Novartis Vaccines
Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
 [2013/18]
Former [2010/31]01 / PODDA, Audino
Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
02 / RAPPUOLI, Rino
Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/18]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2010/31]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date08854338.425.11.2008
[2010/31]
WO2008IB03580
Priority number, dateUS20070004334P26.11.2007         Original published format: US 4334 P
GB2008001030505.06.2008         Original published format: GB 0810305
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009068992
Date:04.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2211901
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2211901
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/145
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/31]
TitleGerman:IMPFUNG MIT MEHREREN STÄMMEN VON H5-INFLUENZA-A-VIRUS[2010/31]
English:VACCINATION WITH MULTIPLE CLADES OF H5 INFLUENZA A VIRUS[2010/31]
French:VACCINATION PAR DE MULTIPLES CLADES DU VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE A H5[2010/31]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2010National basic fee paid 
11.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/31]
22.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2012Observations by third parties
20.12.2012Fee for grant paid
20.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2013Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP12198671.5  / EP2614835
EP19192588.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014   
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
West, Heloise
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 [2014/11]
13.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0250/16
06.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.08.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/34]
02.01.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/02]
17.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
MT25.11.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IE25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
HU26.11.2015
SE26.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
DK30.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2017/40]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IE25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
HU26.11.2015
SE26.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
DK30.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
MT30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/46]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IE25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
HU26.11.2015
SE26.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
DK30.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/45]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IE25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
HU26.11.2015
SE26.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/39]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
HU26.11.2015
SE26.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/38]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
PT25.05.2016
IS31.05.2016
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/36]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SI26.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/35]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
NO30.11.2015
GR02.06.2016
Former [2016/34]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
CZ25.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
Former [2016/28]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
MC30.11.2015
Former [2015/30]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
LU25.11.2014
Former [2014/11]EE01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
Former [2014/10]EE01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
Former [2013/50]BG01.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]  - STEPHENSON I ET AL, "Boosting immunity to influenza H5N1 with MF59-adjuvanted H5N3 A/Duck/Singapore/97 vaccine in a primed human population", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20030402), vol. 21, no. 15, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1687 - 1693, XP004413557 [X] 1-26 * page 1687 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00632-1
 [X]  - STEPHENSON IAIN ET AL, "Phase I evaluation of intranasal trivalent inactivated influenza vaccine with nontoxigenic Escherichia coli enterotoxin and novel biovector as mucosal adjuvants, using adult volunteers", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200605), vol. 80, no. 10, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4962 - 4970, XP002519288 [X] 1-26 * page 4962 * * abstract * * page 4963, column L, paragraph L * * page 4969, column L, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.80.10.4962-4970.2006
 [X]  - BRESSON J L ET AL, "Safety and immunogenicity of an inactivated split-virion influenza A/Vietnam/1194/2004 (H5N1) vaccine: phase I randomised trial", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, vol. 367, no. 9523, ISSN 0140-6736, (20060520), pages 1657 - 1664, (20060520), XP025094558 [X] 1-26 * page 1657 * * abstract * * page 1658, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(06)68656-X
 [X]  - KEITEL ET AL, "Preparing for a possible pandemic: influenza A/H5N1 vaccine development", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20071001), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 1471-4892, pages 484 - 490, XP022300861 [X] 1-26 * Box 1; page 485 * * page 486; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2007.06.004
 [DA]  - HAAHEIM L R, "Original antigenic sin. A confounding issue?", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (2003), Database accession no. NLM15088775, XP002519290 [DA] * abstract *
    [ ] - DEVELOPMENTS IN BIOLOGICALS 2003, (2003), vol. 115, ISSN 1424-6074, pages 49 - 53
 [DPX]  - STEPHENSON IAIN ET AL, "Antigenically distinct MF59-adjuvanted vaccine to boost immunity to H5N1.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 9 OCT 2008, (20081009), vol. 359, no. 15, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 1631 - 1633, XP002519289 [DPX] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMc0805274
Examination   - PLOS ONE, vol. 3, page E2432
    - VIROLOGY JOURNAL, vol. 5, pages 1 - 9
    - HOELSCHER MARY A ET AL, "A broadly protective vaccine against globally dispersed clade 1 and clade 2 H5N1 influenza viruses", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200804), Database accession no. PREV200800353107
    - JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (200804), vol. 197, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1086/529522, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1185 - 1188
    - VACCINE, vol. 27, pages 4187 - 4195
    - Vilamoura EIC Conference, September 2008. Kistner et al, 'Induction of cross-clade anti-H5N1 immune responses...'
    - Cannes IVW Conference, April 2009 Schwarz et al, 'Single dose primary vaccination...'
otherWO2008009309