Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2225822

EP2225822 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRIDGELESS BOOST CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eltek Valere AS
P.O. Box 2340 Strømsø
3003 Drammen / NO
[2010/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MYHRE, Erik
Rundtom 32
N-1385 Asker / NO
 [2010/36]
Representative(s)Onsagers AS
Munkedamsveien 35
P.O. Box 1813 Vika
0123 Oslo / NO
[2012/31]
Former [2010/36]Onsagers Ltd
c/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street
London SW1Y 4LR / GB
Application number, filing date08854373.121.11.2008
[2010/36]
WO2008NO00415
Priority number, dateGB2007002340229.11.2007         Original published format: GB 0723402
US20070990923P29.11.2007         Original published format: US 990923 P
[2010/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009070031
Date:04.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2225822
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2225822
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/42
[2010/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/03]
Former [2010/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BRÜCKENLOSEN AUFWÄRTSWANDLERS[2010/36]
English:CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRIDGELESS BOOST CONVERTER[2010/36]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR-ÉLÉVATEUR DE TENSION SANS PONT[2010/36]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2010National basic fee paid 
29.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/36]
05.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2012Fee for grant paid
21.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.04.2013  07.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/24]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.2013  07.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
05.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0217/16
27.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
LU21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
TR21.11.2013
ES22.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
BG08.08.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2015/42]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
LU21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
TR21.11.2013
ES22.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
BG30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2015/34]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
LU21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
ES22.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
BG30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2015/33]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
ES22.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
BG30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2015/23]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
ES22.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2015/12]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
AT21.11.2013
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2015/11]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
PL21.11.2013
RO21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IE21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
DK30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/42]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
HU22.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
HR21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/39]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
NL01.06.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/38]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
IT21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CZ21.11.2013
FI21.11.2013
SK21.11.2013
SE22.11.2013
SI22.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
PT21.05.2014
GR03.06.2014
Former [2014/36]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CH30.11.2013
EE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
Former [2014/34]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
MC02.12.2013
Former [2014/33]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
MC02.12.2013
Former [2013/51]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
MT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
LV01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY01.08.2012
LT01.08.2012
IS01.12.2012
Former [2013/08]LT01.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006220628  (SOLDANO MARCO [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017]; figures 8,9a,9b *;
 [A]US4412277  (MITCHELL DANIEL M [US]) [A] 4,8 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 36; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006198172  (WOOD PETER [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0058] - [0070]; figures 5-8 *
 [A]  - LU B ET AL, "Bridgeless PFC implementation using one cycle control technique", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2005. APEC 2005. TWENTIETH ANNUAL IEEE AUSTIN, TX, USA 6-10 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20050306), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-8975-5, pages 812 - 817Vol.2, XP010809329 [A] 1-8 * page 815; figure 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2005.1453073
by applicantUS2006220628
 US2006198172
 US4412277
 GB721420
 GB721413
    - MOHAN; UNDELAND; ROBBINS, Power Electronics: converters, applications, and design
    - LU B ET AL., "Bridgeless PFC implementation using one cycle control technique", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, APEC 2005, (20050306), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/APEC.2005.1453073, pages 812 - 817, XP055248241

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2005.1453073