Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2225822 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2225822



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1514
06.11.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
25.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.01.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.01.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.01.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
17.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
06.05.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.03.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
10.02.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.01.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.01.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
27.11.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
27.11.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
27.11.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 26
05.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 41
02.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
30.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
30.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
30.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
30.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
02.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 277
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
02.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
02.10.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
08.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
29.05.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.05.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.05.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
07.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 22
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
10.10.2013 Claims Opposition 3
10.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
05.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.06.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 226
30.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
30.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.06.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.06.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.04.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.04.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
02.04.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.03.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
05.03.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 8
05.03.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.12.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State Search / examination 1
20.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
21.07.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.06.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
09.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.06.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
09.04.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.06.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
25.06.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
04.06.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.06.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 13
17.03.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.03.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3