Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2225822


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.01.2020 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
01.02.2019 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
30.03.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
03.02.2016 Change: Appeal number
27.01.2016 New entry: Appeal number
27.01.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
27.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
11.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
28.05.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
22.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
15.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
11.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
11.10.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.06.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
10.05.2013 Opposition filed published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
08.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
01.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
18.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
29.06.2012 (Expected) grant published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
27.06.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.06.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.05.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2012 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2011 Change - designated states published on  18.01.2012  [2012/03]
29.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.02.2011 Change - extension states published on  09.03.2011  [2011/10]
26.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.08.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.09.2010  [2010/36]
06.08.2010 Request for examination filed published on  08.09.2010  [2010/36]
21.07.2010 Amendment by applicant
02.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
30.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication