Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2225822
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2225822Global Dossier 01.08.2012B1
EP2225822 08.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2225822T 12.11.2012T3
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2392374T 10.12.2012T3
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2455128 21.03.2012B
GB2455128 03.06.2009A
GB0723402D 09.01.2008D0
Priority number Date
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20120836T 30.11.2012T1
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2225822T 31.12.2012T3
Priority number Date
EP08854373 21.11.2008
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2225822T 31.12.2012T1
Priority number Date
EP08854373 21.11.2008
US99092307 29.11.2007
WO2008NO00415 21.11.2008
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009070031Global Dossier 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
GB0723402 29.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2225822E 23.10.2012E
Priority number Date
US99092307 29.11.2007
GB0723402 29.11.2007