Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2219595

EP2219595 - POLYSACCHARIDE GEL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN Industrie, SAS
Route de Promery
254 ZA Pre Mairy
74370 Pringy / FR
[2019/44]
Former [2016/06]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STROUMPOULIS, Dimitrios
6616 Abrego Road, 4
Goleta CA 93117 / US
02 / MUDD, Christopher, S.
5477 Ralston Street,201
Ventura CA 93003 / US
03 / TEZEL, Ahmet
3946 Stacy Lane
Santa Barbara CA 93110 / US
 [2012/04]
Former [2011/34]01 / STROUMPOULIS, Dimitrios
6616 Abrego Road, 4
Goleta CA 93117 / US
02 / MUDD, Christopher, S.
5477 Ralston Street,201
Ventura CA 93003 / US
03 / TEZEL, Ahmet
112 Gerard Drive
Goleta CA 93117 / US
Former [2010/34]01 / STROUMPOULIS, Dimitrios
6616 Abrego Road, 4
Goleta CA 93117 / US
02 / MUDD, Christopher, S.
451 Whitman Street B
Goleta CA 93117 / US
03 / TEZEL, Ahmet
112 Gerard Drive
Goleta CA 93117 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/06]
Former [2010/34]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08855758.224.11.2008
[2010/34]
WO2008US84515
Priority number, dateUS20070991473P30.11.2007         Original published format: US 991473 P
US2008027616721.11.2008         Original published format: US 276167
[2010/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009073437
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2219595
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2219595
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/49, A61K8/67, A61K47/18, A61K47/36, A61K47/42, A61K31/715, A61K31/737, C08B37/08, C08J3/075, C08L5/08, A61K8/60, A61K8/73, A61K8/04, A61K47/38, A61Q19/08, A61K31/717, A61K31/721, A61K31/727, A61K31/728, A61K31/738, C08K5/053
[2015/32]
Former International [2010/34]A61K8/60, A61K8/73, A61K8/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08, A61K9/10, A61K31/738, C08B37/00, A61K9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/06]
Former [2010/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:POLYSACCHARIDE GEL FORMULIERUNG[2015/32]
English:POLYSACCHARIDE GEL FORMULATION[2010/34]
French:FORMULATION DE GEL DE POLYSACCHARIDES[2010/34]
Former [2010/34]POLYSACCHARID-GELFORMULIERUNG
Entry into regional phase17.06.2010National basic fee paid 
17.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
11.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2015Fee for grant paid
30.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16154776.5  / EP3047844
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.11.2016   
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
 02  10.11.2016   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2016/50]
19.12.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.05.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.06.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition06.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1743/18
31.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.11.2008
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
IE24.11.2016
MT24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/29]HU24.11.2008
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU24.11.2008
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/15]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9200105  (GENZYME CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 28 - page 6, line 34; claim - *;
 [E]WO2009028764  (UNIV SOGANG IND UNIV COOP FOUN [KR], et al) [E] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [PX]WO2008072230  (MOR RESEARCH APPLIC LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 1-20 * claims 1,10,13,14 *;
 [X]US4605691  (BALAZS ENDRE A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * example 16 *;
 [PA]WO2008034176  (ULTRACEUTICALS R & D PTY LTD [AU], et al) [PA] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004265389  (YUI NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] - [0028] *;
 [A]US2003031638  (JOSHI VIJAY KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0025] , [0026] , [0034] , [0047] , [0048] *;
 [A]EP0273823  (MERO ROUSSELOT SATIA SA [FR]) [A] 1-20 * example 5 *
OppositionWO2006020994
 DE102006034529
 US6387382
 JPH01113401
 DE4339486
 WO03000191
 US6387382  * Tabellen 1 und 2 *
    - Anonymous, "Flavonoide", Wikipedia, die freie Enzyklopädie, (20161205), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Spezial:Buch&bookcmd=download&collection_id=da935dff7b399341cf271b729d723900a82726f6&writer=rdf2latex&return_to=Flavonoide, XP055325820
    - Kazuhiro Mio, Robert Stern, "Inhibitors of the hyaluronidases", Matrix Biology, (20020000), vol. 21, pages 31 - 37, XP055325833

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0945-053X(01)00185-8
    - isao Kakegawa, et al., "Inhibitory Effects of Tannins on Hyaluronidase Activation", Chem. Pharm. Bull., (19850000), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 5079 - 5082, XP055325842
    - U R Kuppusamy, N P Das, "Inhibitory effects of flavonoids on several venom hyaluronidases", Experientia, (19910000), vol. 47, pages 1196 - 1200, XP055325849

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01918384