Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2229186

EP2229186 - CARBOHYDRATE CONJUGATES AS DELIVERY AGENTS FOR OLIGONUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc.
300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2010/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MANOHARAN, Muthiah
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / RAJEEV, Kallanthottathil, G.
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
03 / NARAYANANNAIR, JAYAPRAKASH K.
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
04 / MAIER, Martin
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
 [2010/38]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08855774.904.12.2008
[2010/38]
WO2008US85574
Priority number, dateUS20080097261P16.09.2008         Original published format: US 97261 P
US20080091093P22.08.2008         Original published format: US 91093 P
US20070013597P13.12.2007         Original published format: US 13597 P
US20070992309P04.12.2007         Original published format: US 992309 P
US20080127751P14.05.2008         Original published format: US 127751 P
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009073809
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2229186
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009
[2010/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48
[2010/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/38]
TitleGerman:KOHLENHYDRAT-KONJUGATE ALS MITTEL ZUR ABGABE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN[2010/38]
English:CARBOHYDRATE CONJUGATES AS DELIVERY AGENTS FOR OLIGONUCLEOTIDES[2010/38]
French:CONJUGUÉS GLUCIDIQUES UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'AGENTS D'ADMINISTRATION POUR DES OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES[2010/38]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2010National basic fee paid 
01.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
09.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
31.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1970/17
31.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP16001273.8  / EP3141265
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006020768  (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,18-20 * the whole document * * pages 50-57; figure 4; compounds 97-104 * * pages 99-110 *;
 [X]WO2006078278  (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,18-20 * the whole document * * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 11 * * page 19, lines 10-15 * * page 25, line 17 - page 27, line 6; figures 1,2,4; examples 4-6,13 *;
 [Y]US2006148740  (PLATENBURG GERARD J [NL]) [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * figure 4 *;
 [Y]  - RENSEN PATRICK C N ET AL, "Design and synthesis of novel N-acetylgalactosamine-terminated glycolipids for targeting of lipoproteins to the hepatic asialoglycoprotein receptor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20041104), vol. 47, no. 23, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5798 - 5808, XP002551237 [Y] 2,9-16 * the whole document * * pages 5799-801 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm049481d
 [Y]  - ZATSEPIN TIMOFEI S ET AL, "Synthesis and applications of oligonucleotide-carbohydrate conjugates.", CHEMISTRY & BIODIVERSITY OCT 2004, (200410), vol. 1, no. 10, ISSN 1612-1880, pages 1401 - 1417, XP002551178 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * page 1405; compound 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbdv.200490104
 [Y]  - DUBBER MICHAEL ET AL, "Solid-phase synthesis of multivalent glycoconjugates on a DNA synthesizer.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200301), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 239 - 246, XP002551179 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * compound 15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0256244
 [Y]  - MURATA J ET AL, "Design of quaternary chitosan conjugate having antennary galactose residues as a gene delivery tool", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (19970201), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 105 - 109, XP004063801 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(96)00154-3
 [Y]  - KATAJISTO JOHANNA ET AL, "Solid-phase synthesis of multiantennary oligonucleotide glycoconjugates utilizing on-support oximation", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200407), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 890 - 896, XP002551180 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * figures 2,3; compounds 14,15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc049955n
 [Y]  - KATAJISTO JOHANNA ET AL, "An aminooxy-functionalized non-nucleosidic phosphoramidite for the construction of multiantennary oligonucleotide glycoconjugates on a solid support.", CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN NUCLEIC ACID CHEMISTRY / EDITED BY SERGE L. BEAUCAGE ... [ET AL.] JUL 2005, (200507), vol. Chapter 4, ISSN 1934-9289, page Unit 4.26, XP002551181 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * figure 4.26.3; compound 12 *
 [Y]  - KATAJISTO J ET AL, "Solid-phase synthesis of oligonucleotide glycoconjugates bearing three different glycosyl groups: Orthogonally protected bis(hydroxymethyl)-N,N'- bis(3-hydroxypropyl)malondiamide phosphoramidite as key building block", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 20041029 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY US, (20041029), vol. 69, no. 22, pages 7609 - 7615, XP002551182 [Y] 1-16,18-20 * the whole document * * figure 2; compound 26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo048984o
 [PA]  - KARSKELA MARIKA ET AL, "Synthesis and Cellular Uptake of Fluorescently Labeled Multivalent Hyaluronan Disaccharide Conjugates of Oligonucleotide Phosphorothioates", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200812), vol. 19, no. 12, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2549 - 2558, XP002551183

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc800260y
 [A]  - CHOI YOUNGSEON ET AL, "Targeting cancer cells with DNA-assembled dendrimers: a mix and match strategy for cancer.", CELL CYCLE (GEORGETOWN, TEX.) MAY 2005, (200505), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1551-4005, pages 669 - 671, XP002551184
 [A]  - VAINO A R ET AL, "Synthesis of a D-lactosyl cluster-nucleoside conjugate", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS 1997 GB, (1997), no. 19, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 1871 - 1872, XP002551185

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a702809a