Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2215866

EP2215866 - OPPORTUNISTIC SPECTRUM SENSING OPTIMIZATION FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola Solutions, Inc.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg IL 60196 / US
[2011/14]
Former [2010/32]For all designated states
Motorola, Inc.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUDHRI, Apoorv
8759 NW 36th Street
Sunrise Florida 33351 / US
02 / RAO, Yadunandana N.
10220 Reflection Boulevard
105
Sunrise Florida 33351 / US
 [2016/01]
Former [2010/32]01 / CHAUDHRI, Apoorv
8759 NW 36th Street
Sunrise Florida 33351 / US
02 / RAO, Yadunandana N.
10220 Reflection Boulevard 105
Sunrise Florida 33351 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2010/32]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08856692.205.11.2008
[2010/32]
WO2008US82413
Priority number, dateUS2007094630628.11.2007         Original published format: US 946306
[2010/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009073303
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2215866
Date:11.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009
[2010/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2215866
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/14
[2010/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2010/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:OPPORTUNISTISCHE SPEKTRENERFASSUNGSOPTIMIERUNG FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2010/32]
English:OPPORTUNISTIC SPECTRUM SENSING OPTIMIZATION FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2010/32]
French:OPTIMISATION OPPORTUNE DE LA DÉTECTION DE SPECTRE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION[2010/32]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2010National basic fee paid 
05.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
17.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Fee for grant paid
30.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.11.2008
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
TR06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU05.11.2008
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/15]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL06.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]  - CORDEIRO C ET AL, "An introduction to the first wireless Standard based on Cognitive Radios", JOURNAL OF COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMY PUBLISHERS, OULU, FI, (20060401), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1796-2021, pages 38 - 47, XP002486875 [X] 1-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - POVEY G J R ET AL, "TDD-CDMA extension to FDD-CDMA based third generation cellular system", 1997 IEEE 6TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS RECORD. SAN DIEGO, 12 - 16TH. OCT. 1997; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19971012), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-3777-0, pages 813 - 817, XP010248819 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph 4.; paragraph [00IV] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1997.627276
 [A]  - HAINES R ET AL, "Towards Integrated Wireless Systems: Inter-Mode Monitoring Techniques", COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2006. ISCC '06. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH IEEE S YMPOSIUM ON CAGLIARI, ITALY 26-29 JUNE 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060626), ISBN 978-0-7695-2588-4, pages 3 - 7, XP010937954 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCC.2006.163
by applicant   - "IEEE 802.22: An Introduction to the First Wireless Standard based on Cognitive Radios", CARLOS CORDEIRO ET AL., Journal of Communications, ACADEMY PUBLISHERS, (20060401), vol. 1, pages 38 - 47
    - GORDON J R POVEY ET AL., "TDD-CDMA Extension to FDD-CDMA Based Third Generation Cellular System", 1997 IEEE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS RECORD., (19971012), vol. 2, pages 813 - 817