Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2218116

EP2218116 - SLIM LED PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd.
148-29, Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-801 / KR
[2010/33]
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Eun Jung
1B-35, 727-5 Wonsi-dong
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR
 [2019/02]
Former [2010/33]01 / SEO, Eun Jung
1B-35, 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR
Representative(s)Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2010/33]Stolmár Scheele & Partner
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08856932.218.11.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008KR06777
Priority number, dateKR2007012446903.12.2007         Original published format: KR 20070124469
[2010/33]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009072757
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2218116
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2218116
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/48, // H01L33/62, H01L33/54
[2012/14]
Former International [2010/33]H01L33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2010/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DÜNNES LED-PAKET[2010/33]
English:SLIM LED PACKAGE[2010/33]
French:BOÎTIER DEL MINCE[2010/33]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2010National basic fee paid 
28.04.2010Search fee paid 
28.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
05.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2018Fee for grant paid
23.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18199313.0  / EP3444857
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2014
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2020/13]
Former [2019/49]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005151149  (CHIA CHEE W [MY], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0026] * [I] 6;
 [X]US2006220048  (MATSUMOTO IWAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [X]US2003107316  (MURAKAMI GEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005280017  (OSHIO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * claim 11 *
International search[X]KR20060059575  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]KR20020065729  (CHIPPAC KOREA CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]US6603148  (SANO MASASHI [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2006179541  (ENOMOTO CO LTD)
ExaminationJPH02125454
 US2004159850
 US2007269927