Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2232775

EP2232775 - DYNAMIC COMMUNICATION STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.06.2014
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstraße 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2016/36]
Former [2010/39]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Morris, J.
3426 East 50th Street
Indianapolis IN 46205 / US
02 / MARKISOHN, David, Bradley
7811 Prarie View Drive
Indianapolis IN 46256 / US
03 / SPIETH, Christopher
19549 Lamong Rd.
Sheridan IN 46069 / US
04 / SPIETH, Christopher
19549 Lamong Rd.
Sheridan IN 46069 / US
05 / CUMMINGS, Allen, B.
17221 Rushmore Dr.
Westfield IN 46074 / US
06 / SCROGGIN, Adam, R.
19613 Wagon Trail Dr
Noblesville IN 46060-1110 / US
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/39]Bittner, Thomas L.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/39]Bittner, Thomas L.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80366 München / DE
Application number, filing date08858269.721.11.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008EP09861
Priority number, dateUS2007099993407.12.2007         Original published format: US 999934
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009071189
Date:11.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2232775
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009
[2010/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, G06F9/46, H04L29/06
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:DYNAMIscher Kommunikationsstapel[2010/39]
English:DYNAMIC COMMUNICATION STACK[2010/39]
French:PILE DE COMMUNICATION DYNAMIQUE[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2010National basic fee paid 
07.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
19.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2017
13.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1504/18
31.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9935856  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-29 * page 7, line 10 - line L * * page 21, line 6 - page 23, line 7 * * page 30, line 14 - line 20 * * page 33, line 14 - line 24 * * page 46, line 3 - page 60, line 19 *;
 [X]US7072356  (CLANCY T TERRY [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 11 - line 47 * * column 4, line 27 - line 30 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 45 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 32 *;
 [X]  - "The HAVi Specification: Specification of the Home Audio/Video Interoperabilty (HAVi) Architecture", HAVI SPECIFICATION, XX, XX, (19981119), pages 1 - 384, XP002116332 [X] 1-29 * page 17, line 4 - page 61, line 21 *
 [X]  - JOHN HOTCHKISS ET AL, "MD-Adapt: A Proposed Architecture for Open-Source Medical Device Interoperability", HIGH CONFIDENCE MEDICAL DEVICES, SOFTWARE, AND SYSTEMS AND MEDICAL DEV ICE PLUG-AND-PLAY INTEROPERABILITY, 2007. HCMDSS-MDPNP. JOINT WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070601), ISBN 978-0-7695-3081-8, pages 167 - 170, XP031207401 [X] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GIACOMO CABRI ET AL, "Agent-Based Plug-and-Play Integration of Role-Enabled Medical Devices", HIGH CONFIDENCE MEDICAL DEVICES, SOFTWARE, AND SYSTEMS AND MEDICAL DEV ICE PLUG-AND-PLAY INTEROPERABILITY, 2007. HCMDSS-MDPNP. JOINT WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070601), ISBN 978-0-7695-3081-8, pages 111 - 121, XP031207387 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHNAYDER V ET AL, "Sensor Networks for Medical Care", TECHNICAL REPORT HARVARD UNIVERSITY,, (20050101), vol. TR-08-05, pages 1 - 14, XP002477463 [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [04.2] , [04.3]; figure 7 *