Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2216060

EP2216060 - POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE FOR BLOOD TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/32]POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE FOR TREATING BLOOD
[2012/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd.
1-105, Kanda Jinbo-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2012/35]
Former [2012/29]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd.
105, Kanda Jinbo-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2010/32]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kuraray Medical Co., Ltd.
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIDAKA, Hidetoshi
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
02 / ICHI, Takahiro
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
 [2012/40]
Former [2010/32]01 / HIDAKA, Hidetoshi
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
02 / ICHI, Takahiro
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/32]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date08858348.904.12.2008
[2010/32]
WO2008JP72027
Priority number, dateJP2007031621406.12.2007         Original published format: JP 2007316214
[2010/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009072548
Date:11.06.2009
Language:JA
[2009/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2216060
Date:11.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2216060
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.06.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/18, B01D63/02, B01D69/08, B01D71/44, B01D71/68, C02F1/44
[2010/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/32]
TitleGerman:PORÖSE HOHLFASERMEMBRAN ZUR BLUTBEHANDLUNG[2010/32]
English:POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE FOR BLOOD TREATMENT[2012/04]
French:MEMBRANE POREUSE À FIBRES CREUSES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SANG[2012/04]
Former [2010/32]POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE FOR TREATING BLOOD
Former [2010/32]MEMBRANE POREUSE À FIBRES CREUSES POUR TRAITER LE SANG
Entry into regional phase20.05.2010Translation filed 
20.05.2010National basic fee paid 
20.05.2010Search fee paid 
20.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
16.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2012Fee for grant paid
14.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.07.2013   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponents representative
Ricker, Mathias
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.2013   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponents representative
Ricker, Mathias
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
07.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2064/15
03.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
16.08.2012Request for further processing filed
16.08.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.08.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2008
AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
LU04.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/51]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/47]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
IE04.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
DK03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG03.01.2013
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/33]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT03.10.2012
BE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI03.10.2012
HR03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
Former [2013/20]LT03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
NO03.01.2013
Former [2013/11]SI03.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1547628  (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0013] , [0037]; example - *;
 [XI]EP1834655  (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0018]; example 1 * [I] 4
International search[X]JPH06165926  (KURARAY CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2004075741  (ASAHI KASEI CORP.)