Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2216060 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2216060



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 751
21.03.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
13.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
28.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
28.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
28.04.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 30
27.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Claims Appeal 2
27.04.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 30
22.04.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
19.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.03.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.12.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.12.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.12.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.12.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.12.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
03.11.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.10.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
24.07.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 20
24.07.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
24.07.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.04.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
18.03.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
17.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
17.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
17.03.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
17.03.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
16.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Description Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Description Opposition 1
16.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.03.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
17.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.11.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
06.11.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
03.11.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.10.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
28.10.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
23.10.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
20.10.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.10.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
18.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 2
13.02.2014 Claims Opposition 2
13.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
16.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
02.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
02.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
05.10.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.09.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.08.2012 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
16.08.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.07.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
15.06.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 2
13.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.06.2012 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
14.05.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.05.2012 Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification Search / examination 1
08.05.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 12
27.04.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
02.01.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.01.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.01.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.01.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 61
24.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2011 Description Search / examination 9
24.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
24.11.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
19.09.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.05.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
01.10.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
24.08.2010 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
16.07.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.07.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.06.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
20.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
20.05.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Description Search / examination 58
20.05.2010 Drawings Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
16.04.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.07.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
11.06.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2009 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2009 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31