Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2216060


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.12.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
03.11.2015 Change: Appeal number
02.10.2015 New entry: Appeal number
02.10.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
23.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2014 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
14.11.2014 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
14.02.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.12.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
06.08.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
12.07.2013 Opposition filed published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
28.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2013  [2013/31]
07.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
10.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
03.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
19.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
12.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
08.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
31.08.2012 (Expected) grant published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
30.08.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.08.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
22.08.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.07.2012 Change - applicant published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
15.06.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.06.2012 Change - applicant published on  18.07.2012  [2012/29]
22.05.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.05.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2011 Change - English title published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
23.12.2011 Change - French title published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
21.12.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.11.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.09.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.05.2011 First examination report
11.05.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.04.2011 Supplementary search report published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
11.02.2011 Change - extension states published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
10.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.07.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
09.07.2010 Request for examination filed published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
15.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2010 Amendment by applicant
29.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2009 PCT data prior to European publication