Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2222930

EP2222930 - METHOD FOR FASTENING A PLATE OR GLASS PANEL IN A FRAME ELEMENT AND SEALING ELEMENT FOR USE IN SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilgen Door Systems AG
Freiburgstrasse 34
3150 Schwarzenburg / CH
[2011/22]
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
Kaba Gilgen AG
Freiburgstrasse 34
3150 Schwarzenburg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / DÜTSCH, Beat
Fuhrenstrasse 19
3098 Schliern / CH
02 / LEHMANN, Manfred
Bagerstrasse 3
3185 Schmitten / CH
 [2010/40]
Former [2010/35]01 / DÜTSCH, Beat
Fuhrenstrasse 19
3098 Schliern / CH
02 / LEHMANN, Manfred
Bodenmattstrasse 144
3185 Schmitten / CH
Representative(s)Bremi, Tobias Hans , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/35]Bremi, Tobias Hans , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date08861800.403.12.2008
[2010/35]
WO2008CH00508
Priority number, dateCH2007000197019.12.2007         Original published format: CH 19702007
[2010/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009076783
Date:25.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2222930
Date:01.09.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009
[2010/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2222930
Date:07.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/56
[2010/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER PLATTE ODER GLASSCHEIBE IN EINEM RAHMENELEMENT SOWIE DICHTUNGSELEMENT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SOLCHEN VERFAHREN[2010/35]
English:METHOD FOR FASTENING A PLATE OR GLASS PANEL IN A FRAME ELEMENT AND SEALING ELEMENT FOR USE IN SUCH A METHOD[2010/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN PANNEAU OU D'UNE VITRE DE VERRE DANS UN ÉLÉMENT DE CADRE ET ÉLÉMENT DE JOINT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE EMPLOYÉ DANS UN TEL PROCÉDÉ[2010/35]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2010National basic fee paid 
19.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/35]
16.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2014Fee for grant paid
27.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  06.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
dormakaba Deutschland GmbH
Dorma Platz 1
58256 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Balder IP Law, S.L.
Castellana 93
28046 Madrid / ES
 [2017/10]
Former [2015/11]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015   
Dorma Deutschland GmbH
Dorma Platz 1
58256 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Balder IP Law, S.L.
Castellana 93
ES-28046 Madrid / ES
13.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2668/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2008
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE03.12.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU03.12.2008
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE03.12.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE03.12.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/25]BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE03.12.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE03.12.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU03.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2005081981  (HEIKKILA KURT E [US]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 1-13;
 [Y]US4581089  (MACMILLAN DOUGLAS R [US]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]DE202005003874U  (SCHOTT AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202006004123U  (WIRUS FENSTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1271472  (STANDARD PRODUCTS CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4987699  (GOLD PETER N [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, lines 28-54; figures 7,8 *