Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2232575

EP2232575 - PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES PROTECTED FROM ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.07.2013  [2013/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miasole
2590 Walsh Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / HOLLARS, Dennis
C/o Miasole 2590 Walsh Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
02 / PEARCE, David
C/o Miasole 2590 Walsh Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/43]Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2010/39]Wichmann, Hendrik
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date08862186.711.12.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US13570
Priority number, dateUS2007001376114.12.2007         Original published format: US 13761
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009078936
Date:25.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2232575
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009
[2010/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048, H01L31/05
[2012/28]
Former International [2010/39]H01L31/04, H01L31/042
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:VOR DER UMWELT GESCHÜTZTE PHOTOVOLTAIKANORDNUNGEN[2010/39]
English:PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES PROTECTED FROM ENVIRONMENT[2010/39]
French:DISPOSITIFS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES PROTÉGÉS CONTRE L'ENVIRONNEMENT[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2010National basic fee paid 
13.07.2010Search fee paid 
13.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
08.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/27]
12.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE10164273  (SOLARWATT SOLAR SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 4,11,15;
 [XI]WO03038911  (DGTEC [FR]; SOLAR APPOLON [FR]; BARET GUY [FR]; LAUVRAY HUBERT [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12-14 * abstract * [I] 4,9,11;
 [X]EP0474349  (EEV LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 9a *;
 [X]DE10032386  (ZIMMER MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 14 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2000174297  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4598306  (NATH, PREM ET AL.);
 [Y]KR19990006965  (CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]US6743524  (SCHAEPKENS, MARC);
 [A]US6548912  (GRAFF, GORDON LEE, ET AL.)