blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2231924 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2231924



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 800
10.05.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
12.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.01.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.01.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.01.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
19.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.12.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 9
12.12.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
09.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.12.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
07.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
07.06.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
02.06.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.05.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.05.2015 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
06.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.05.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
10.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 3
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 6
16.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
04.04.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
27.03.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 2
10.03.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.12.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
30.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
29.07.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
29.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
29.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.07.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.06.2013 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
31.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
31.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
25.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.08.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.04.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2012 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Opposition 2
20.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.04.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.04.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.04.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.02.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
28.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.02.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
06.05.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
18.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
18.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.12.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.12.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 67
01.09.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.08.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.06.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
02.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.06.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.06.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
03.05.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.07.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 69
25.06.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 79
25.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
25.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.12.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.12.2008 Annex International Searching Authority 4
12.12.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 15
12.12.2008 Description International Searching Authority 48
12.12.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 10