Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2235577

EP2235577 - MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, IT
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
[2019/23]
Former [2012/38]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl Zeiss Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Former [2010/40]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LIPPERT, Helmut
Forstweg 58
07745 Jena / DE
02 / WOLLESCHENSKY, Ralf
Ricarda-Huch-Weg 26
07743 Jena / DE
03 / ROHRBACH, Alexander
Goethestrasse 34
79100 Freiburg / DE
04 / FAHRBACH, Florian
Cambridgestr. 8
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 [2019/22]
Former [2010/40]01 / LIPPERT, Helmut
Melanchthonstrasse 4
07743 Jena / DE
02 / WOLLESCHENSKY, Ralf
Ricarda-Huch-Weg 26
07743 Jena / DE
03 / ROHRBACH, Alexander
Goethestrasse 34
79100 Freiburg / DE
04 / FAHRBACH, Florian
Klarastrasse 96b
79106 Freiburg / DE
Representative(s)Loritz, Rainer , et al
Carl Zeiss AG Konzernfunktion Recht und Patente Patentabteilung Jena Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
[2019/23]
Former [2010/40]Hampe, Holger
c/o Carl Zeiss AG Standort Jena Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Application number, filing date08863573.510.12.2008
[2010/40]
WO2008EP10455
Priority number, dateDE2007106327420.12.2007         Original published format: DE102007063274
[2010/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009080210
Date:02.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2235577
Date:06.10.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009
[2010/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2235577
Date:05.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/09, G02B26/08, G02B21/06, G02B21/16, G02B21/10, G02B27/58
[2018/49]
Former International [2010/40]G02B21/10, G02B27/58, G02B21/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/23]
Former [2010/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MIKROSKOP[2010/40]
English:MICROSCOPE[2010/40]
French:MICROSCOPE[2010/40]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2010National basic fee paid 
16.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/40]
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2015/51]
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2019Fee for grant paid
18.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19160825.6  / EP3528029
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/10]CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2020/07]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]DE10257423  (EUROP LAB MOLEKULARBIOLOG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *
 [A]  - RIEKO ARIMOTO ET AL, "IMAGING PROPERTIES OF AXICON IN A SCANNING OPTICAL SYSTEM", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19921101), vol. 31, no. 31, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6653 - 6657, XP000310749 [A] 7,8 * Items "Introduction" and "Discussion" *
International search[A]JP2003185930  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [AD]  - ENGELBRECHT C J ET AL, "RESOLUTION ENHANCEMENT IN A LIGHT-SHEET-BASED MICROSCOPY (SPIM)", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20060515), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1477 - 1479, XP001242795 [AD] 1 * Figur 1 und zugehöriger Text *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.001477
 [A]  - GARCES-CHAVEZ V ET AL, "Simultaneous micromanipulation in multiple planes using a self-reconstructing light beam", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (20020912), Database accession no. 7478439, XP002522638 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [D]  - Nature Nature Publishing Group UK, (20020912), vol. 419, no. 6903, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 145 - 147
 [A]  - WILSON T ET AL, "Scanning two photon fluorescence microscopy with extended depth of field", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (20061215), Database accession no. 9294808, XP002522639 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [D]  - Optics Communications Elsevier Netherlands, (2006), vol. 268, no. 2, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 253 - 260
 [A]  - HUISKEN J ET AL, "Even fluorescence excitation by multidirectional selective plane illumination microscopy (mSPIM)", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (20070901), Database accession no. 9902517, XP002522640 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [D]  - Optics Letters Optical Society of America USA, (20070901), vol. 32, no. 17, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 2608 - 2610
ExaminationDE10257423
    - RIEKO ARIMOTO ET AL, "IMAGING PROPERTIES OF AXICON IN A SCANNING OPTICAL SYSTEM", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19921101), vol. 31, no. 31, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6653 - 6657, XP000310749