Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2231025

EP2231025 - CANNULA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
150 Minuteman Road
Andover, MA 01810 / US
[2020/12]
Former [2010/39]For all designated states
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
150 Minuteman Road
Andover, MA 01810 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TORRIE, Paul, Alexander
8 Bowden Street
Marblehead MA 01945 / US
02 / ILIZALITURRI, Victor, Manuel
Amores 942-21
Colonia Del Valle
Mexico City 03100 / MX
[2020/12]
Former [2010/39]01 / TORRIE, Paul, Alexander
8 Bowden Street
Marblehead MA 01945 / US
02 / ILIZALITURRI, Victor, Manuel
Amores 942-21 Colonia Del Valle
Mexico City 03100 / MX
Representative(s)Smith & Nephew
Group Legal Department
PO Box 81
101 Hessle Road
Hull HU3 2BN / GB
[2020/12]
Former [2014/39]Smith & Nephew
Group Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington
York YO10 5DF / GB
Former [2010/39]Guy, Mark Robert , et al
Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park
Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB
Application number, filing date08863626.117.12.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US87197
Priority number, dateUS20070015960P21.12.2007         Original published format: US 15960 P
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009082656
Date:02.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2231025
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2231025
Date:18.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/02, A61B17/34
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2020/12]
Former [2010/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KANÜLE[2010/39]
English:CANNULA[2010/39]
French:CATHÉTER[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2010National basic fee paid 
13.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
17.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2019
13.06.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2020Fee for grant paid
05.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.11.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.09.2018Request for further processing filed
12.09.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.09.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.08.2017Request for further processing filed
03.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0018306  (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 22 * * figures 4-6 *;
 [X]EP0552980  (LINVATEC CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 22 * * figures 5-10 *;
 [A]US2002123764  (LAJTAI GEORG [AT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2575253  (BICEK JOSEPH F) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *