blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2221463

EP2221463 - DIRECT FUEL-INJECTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2015/01]
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IKEYA, Kenichiro
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / SASAKI, Nobuhiko
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / SONO, Hiroshi
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
04 / YAMAYA, Yukihisa
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
05 / YAMAGUCHI, Akihiro
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
06 / KANEKO, Yoshimasa
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
07 / KATAYAMA, Goichi
c/o HONDA R&DCO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
08 / TAJIMA, Yutaka
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2015/01]
Former [2010/34]01 / IKEYA, Kenichiro
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / SASAKI, Nobuhiko
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / SONO, Hiroshi
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
04 / YAMAYA, Yukihisa
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
05 / YAMAGUCHI, Akihiro
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
06 / KANEKO, Yoshimasa
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
07 / KATAYAMA, Goichi
c/o HONDA R&DCO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
08 / TAJIMA, Yutaka
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Herzog, Markus, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date08863998.412.12.2008
[2010/34]
WO2008JP72654
Priority number, dateJP2007033036721.12.2007         Original published format: JP 2007330367
[2010/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009081765
Date:02.07.2009
Language:JA
[2009/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2221463
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2221463
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.07.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2011
ClassificationIPC:F02B23/06
[2011/40]
CPC:
F02B23/0669 (EP,US); F02B23/0651 (EP,US); F02B23/0696 (EP,US);
F02B2275/14 (EP,US); F02B23/0621 (EP,US); F02B23/0657 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US); Y02T10/12 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2010/34]F02B23/06, F02F3/26, F02F3/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/34]
TitleGerman:DIREKTEINSPRITZMOTOR[2010/34]
English:DIRECT FUEL-INJECTION ENGINE[2010/34]
French:MOTEUR À INJECTION DIRECTE DE CARBURANT[2010/34]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2010Translation filed 
27.05.2010National basic fee paid 
27.05.2010Search fee paid 
27.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
29.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2014Fee for grant paid
17.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2012
Opposition(s)01.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2008
AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
BG31.12.2014
CY31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
MT31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
PT31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
TR31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
[2018/37]
Former [2017/39]HU12.12.2008
AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
BG31.12.2014
CY31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
MT31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
TR31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2016/33]AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2016/24]AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2016/03]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/49]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
IS30.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
PL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/29]FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/24]FI31.12.2014
HR31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
LV31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/23]FI31.12.2014
LT31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT31.12.2014
NO31.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT31.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2034157  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040]; figures 5,6 *;
 [E]EP2039905  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037]; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]JP2002276374  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2000145461  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2002349267  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPS62255520  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD);
 [A]JPS62255524  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD);
 [A]JPS62288311  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD);
 [A]JPS6316124  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD);
 [A]JP2002122024  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP);
 [A]JP2004270476  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD)
by applicantJPH0517369
 JP20060175597
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.