Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2231736

EP2231736 - COATING COMPOSITION FOR ACHIEVING EXCELLENT MVSS ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Coatings GmbH
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Donald, H.
1211 Maxfield Lake Road
Hartland MI 48353 / US
02 / MENOVCIK, Gregory, G.
16623 Highland Lane
Northville MI 48167 / US
03 / DECEMBER, Timothy, S.
546 Parkland
Rochester Hills MI 48307 / US
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/28]Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2010/39]Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E.
BASF Coatings GmbH Patente/Lizenzen, Marken/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23
48136 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date08864046.114.11.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US12802
Priority number, dateUS2007096081520.12.2007         Original published format: US 960815
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009082423
Date:02.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2231736
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2231736
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:C09D161/28, C08G12/32, C09D201/02, C09D175/04
[2012/22]
Former International [2010/39]C08G12/32, C09D175/04, C09D201/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ERZIELUNG VON HERVORRAGENDER MVSS-HAFTUNG[2010/39]
English:COATING COMPOSITION FOR ACHIEVING EXCELLENT MVSS ADHESION[2010/39]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DESTINÉE À DONNER UNE EXCELLENTE ADHÉSION MVSS[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2010National basic fee paid 
20.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
31.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2012Fee for grant paid
02.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.10.2013   
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/47]
Opponent(s)01  08.10.2013   
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
14.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.09.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2209/15
21.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.11.2008
AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
GB14.11.2013
IE14.11.2013
LU14.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU14.11.2008
AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
GB14.11.2013
IE14.11.2013
LU14.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
GB14.11.2013
IE14.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2014/51]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
GB14.11.2013
IE14.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
FR02.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE14.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
NO09.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI09.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002119320  (RAMESH SWAMINATHAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0067] * * claims 1,13,15,38 *