blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2225514

EP2225514 - DRAWER-SHAPED EGG COMPARTMENT IN REFRIGERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2010/36]
Inventor(s)01 / KURT, Melih
Büyüksehir Mh. A-29 D:34
34520 Istanbul / TR
 [2010/36]
Application number, filing date08866185.511.12.2008
[2010/36]
WO2008EP67266
Priority number, dateTR2007000916731.12.2007         Original published format: TR 200709167
[2010/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009083414
Date:09.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2225514
Date:08.09.2010
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:F25D25/02
[2010/36]
CPC:
F25D25/021 (EP); F25D2325/023 (EP); F25D2331/807 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/36]
TitleGerman:SCHUBLADENFÖRMIGES EIERFACH IN KÜHLGERÄTEN[2010/36]
English:DRAWER-SHAPED EGG COMPARTMENT IN REFRIGERATORS[2010/36]
French:CASIER À UFS EN FORME DE TIROIR POUR APPAREILS FRIGORIFIQUES[2010/36]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2010National basic fee paid 
02.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/36]
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/15]
05.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/16]
18.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]US2089359  (GOULOOZE MARTIN J) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 12 *;
 [I]EP1564512  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [I] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]CN2731372Y  (BOXIHUA HOME APPLIANCES CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.