Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2155340

EP2155340 - EXERCISE APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SELECTIVELY VARIABLE STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cybex International, Inc.
10 Trotter Drive
Medway, MA 02053 / US
[2010/08]
Inventor(s)01 / GIANNELLI, Raymond
46 Jackson Circle
Franklin MA 02038 / US
02 / LEE, Scott
13 Old Rt. 44
Pomfret CT 06259 / US
03 / GILLEN, Arnold
1124 Del Lane
Fariboult MN 55021 / US
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date08866250.719.12.2008
[2010/08]
WO2008US87772
Priority number, dateUS20070015917P21.12.2007         Original published format: US 15917 P
[2011/29]
Former [2010/08]US2007001591721.12.2007
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009086162
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2155340
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2155340
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:A63B21/062, A63B23/12
[2010/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:TRAININGSAPPARAT UND -VERFAHREN MIT GEZIELT VARIABLER STABILISIERUNG[2010/08]
English:EXERCISE APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SELECTIVELY VARIABLE STABILIZATION[2010/08]
French:APPAREIL D'EXERCICES ET PROCÉDÉ À STABILISATION SÉLECTIVEMENT VARIABLE[2010/08]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2009National basic fee paid 
17.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/08]
08.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2011Fee for grant paid
09.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2010
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
HU20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
LU19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/29]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
LU19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/25]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
LU19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/22]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/14]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/47]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
IE19.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/34]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/31]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/23]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/21]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/13]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1125599  (NAUTILUS INC [US]) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-13 *;
 [X]WO0114016  (SIMONSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP RL [US]) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * page 1 - page 22; figure 23 *;
 [X]US2004214697  (GERSCHEFSKE KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-27 *;
 [X]US4603855  (SEBELLE LESLIE W [US]) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * column 2, line 4 - column 7, line 57; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US6705976  (PIANE JR ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * column 2, line 18 - column 16, line 27; figures 1-31 *;
 [X]DE19801672  (BOSSERT MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1-18,20-22,24,25,27-31,40,42,43,45-50,52-56,60-64 * column 1 - column 5, line 59; figures 1-6 *
ExaminationUS2007037674
by applicantUS2007037674
 US20170610159