Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2245031

EP2245031 - 6,9-DISUBSTITUTED PURINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS COSMETICS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute of Experimental Botany, Academy of Sciences of the Czech Republic
Rozvojova 263
165 02 Prague 6 - Lysolaje / CZ
[2010/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SZUCOVA, Lucie
Handkeho 757/1A
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
02 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
03 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
04 / VOLLER, Jiri
Pristavni ulice 10B
635 00 Brno-Bystrc / CZ
05 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
78365 Hlubocky / CZ
06 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
07 / MASSINO, Frank J.
86 South Newport Drive
Napa California 94559 / US
 [2010/44]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2014/09]
Former [2010/44]Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date08866388.524.12.2008
[2010/44]
WO2008US88311
Priority number, dateUS2007096655928.12.2007         Original published format: US 966559
[2010/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009086457
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2245031
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2245031
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
KR11.09.2009
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/16, C07D473/34, A61K31/52, A61P7/00
[2011/46]
Former International [2010/44]C07D473/16, C07D473/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/44]
TitleGerman:6,9-DISUBSTITUIERTE PURINDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS KOSMETIKA UND KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2010/44]
English:6,9-DISUBSTITUTED PURINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS COSMETICS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS[2010/44]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE PURINE 6,9-DISUBSTITUÉE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES[2010/44]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2010National basic fee paid 
24.06.2010Search fee paid 
24.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/44]
27.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2014Fee for grant paid
09.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2013
Opposition(s)27.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.12.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU24.12.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/27]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]  ZHANG R ET AL, "CYTOKININ BIOCHEMISTRY IN RELATION TO LEAF SENESCENCE III. THE SENESCENCE-RETARDING ACTIVITY AND METABOLISM OF 9-SUBSTITUTED 6 BENZYLAMINOPURINES IN SOYBEAN LEAVES", JOURNAL OF PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890101), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0721-7595, pages 181 - 198, XP008128462 [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2007009474  (XIE SANCAI [US], et al);
 [A]JP2001356493  (TOYO BOSEKI);
 [A]  - ZHANG R. ET AL., "Retardation of soybean leaf senescence and associated effects on seed composition.", JOURNAL OFPLANT GROWTH REGULATION., (1987), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 15 - 21, XP008136753

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02025371
 [A]  - ABELES F.B. ET AL., "Abscission: The role of aging.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1967), vol. 42, pages 1351 - 1356, XP008136754

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.42.10.1351