Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2226071

EP2226071 - COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, MC, SI
published on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daicel Corporation
3-1, Ofuka-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP
[2016/15]
Former [2015/42]For all designated states
Daicel Corporation
3-1, Ofuka-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0011 / JP
Former [2010/36]For all designated states
Unitika, Ltd.
50, Higashi-Honmachi 1-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0824 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MUKAI, Katsuyuki
c/o Unitika Ltd.
Uji Plant, 23, Uji Kozakura
Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0021 / JP
02 / SHIRAKURA, Yoshiyuki
c/o Unitika Ltd.
Uji Plant, 23, Uji Kozakura
Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0021 / JP
 [2016/15]
Former [2010/36]01 / MUKAI, Katsuyuki
c/o Unitika Ltd. Uji Plant, 23, Uji Kozakura
Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0021 / JP
02 / SHIRAKURA, Yoshiyuki
c/o Unitika Ltd. Uji Plant, 23, Uji Kozakura
Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0021 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/15]
Former [2010/36]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08867917.028.08.2008
[2010/36]
WO2008JP65466
Priority number, dateJP2007033946028.12.2007         Original published format: JP 2007339460
JP2008002278401.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008022784
[2010/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009084275
Date:09.07.2009
Language:JA
[2009/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2226071
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2226071
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
JP09.07.2009
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/045, A23K20/20, A23L33/00, A23L33/15, A61K31/164, A61K36/00, A61P3/06, // A61P3/04
[2016/13]
Former International [2011/22]A61K31/045, A23K1/16, A23L1/30, A23L1/302, A61K31/164, A61K36/00, A61P3/06, // A61P3/04
Former International [2010/36]A61K31/045, A23K1/16, A23L1/30, A23L1/302, A61K31/164, A61K36/00, A61P3/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/15]
Former [2010/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG[2010/36]
English:COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION[2010/36]
French:COMPOSITION POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE[2010/36]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2010Translation filed 
28.06.2010National basic fee paid 
28.06.2010Search fee paid 
28.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/36]
19.08.2011Observations by third parties
15.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2016Fee for grant paid
12.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2014
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
[2017/23]
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]JP2006083151  (ORIZA YUKA KK) [X] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0024] * [A] 11;
 [XA]WO2004112776  (ADVANCED BIONUTRITION EUROP LT [GB], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 23 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 15 * [A] 11;
 [A]WO2006068041  (OKAYASU SHOTEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007116981  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2005112904  (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al);
 [X]JP2006219388  (NAKAMURA GAKUEN, et al);
 [X]JP2007223914  (UNITIKA LTD);
 [X]JP2006104088  (UNITIKA LTD);
 [X]JP2007091693  (ORIZA YUKA KK);
 [X]JP2006089452  (ORIZA YUKA KK);
 [X]JP2006325602  (EHIME INRYO KK);
 [A]JPH01279837  (HOPE CITY)
 [X]  - TAKAO SASAKI, "''Unshu Mikan Extract 'Cript Beta '''", FOOD STYLE 21, (20071201), vol. 11, no. 12, pages 63 - 65,
 [X]  - KEIZO SEKIYA, "Kankitsu, Momo no Seibun ni yoru Insulin Kanjusei no Josho", KAJU KYOKAIHO, (2000), vol. 497, pages 30 - 34,
 [X]  - KEIZO SEKIYA, "Shibo Saibo wa Akudama ka? - Shibo Saibo o Chiisaku suru Nosakumotsu Seibun", AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE, (2006), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 335 - 343,
ExaminationEP1772143
by applicantJP2002326932
 JP2007153845
 WO2005112904
other   - "Samudraphenasodhanam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. HG/989, XP003029027
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, vol. V, page 317,
    - "Kamsya Bhasma Vidhi-02", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/165C, XP003029028
    - Ayurveda Sarasamgrahah, page 99,
    - "Ragah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VK/341, XP003029029
    - Bhrat Nighantu Ratnakara, vol. I, page 635,
    - "Brhat Kravyad Rasa", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG3/1028, XP003029030
    - Yogaratnakarah, page 326,
    - "Kravyada Ras", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG8/143, XP003029031
    - Rasayogaratnakarah, pages 52 - 53,