Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2231869

EP2231869 - DETECTION OF METHICILLIN-RESISTANT STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomerieux Sa
100 Rodophe Street
Durham, NC 27712 / US
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / JAY, Corinne
223 avenue de Grenoble
38180 Seyssins / FR
02 / DEIMAN, Birgit
Dille 19
5063 EE Oisterwijk / NL
03 / VAN STRIJP, Dianne
Zoomweg 11
5215 HN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
04 / VAN DE WIEL, Paul
Aquamarijn 21
5629 HC Eindhoven / NL
 [2013/03]
Former [2010/39]01 / JAY, Corinne
223 avenue de Grenoble
F-38180 Seyssins / FR
02 / DEIMAN, Birgit
Dille 19
NL-5063 EE Oisterwijk / NL
03 / VAN STRIJP, Dianne
Zoomweg 11
NL-5215 HN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
04 / VAN DE WIEL, Paul
Aquamarijn 21
NL-5629 HC Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Schlich, George , et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Schlich, George William , et al
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Former [2010/39]Schlich, George William , et al
Schlich & Co 34 New Road Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5AT / GB
Application number, filing date08868000.419.12.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US13922
Priority number, dateUS20070008680P21.12.2007         Original published format: US 8680 P
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009085221
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2231869
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2231869
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N33/48
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS VON METHICILLIN-RESISTENTEM STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS[2010/39]
English:DETECTION OF METHICILLIN-RESISTANT STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS[2010/39]
French:DÉTECTION DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS RÉSISTANT À LA MÉTHICILLINE[2013/03]
Former [2010/39]DÉTECTION DE<I>STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS</I>RÉSISTANT À LA MÉTHICILLINE
Entry into regional phase09.07.2010National basic fee paid 
09.07.2010Search fee paid 
09.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
13.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Fee for grant paid
18.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13169580.1  / EP2657351
EP18176851.6
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 02  28.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  28.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
James Poole Limited
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2016/13]
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 02  28.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  28.02.2014  27.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
James Poole Limited
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014   
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Richter, Carsten
Postfach 11 38
23501 Lübeck / DE
 02  28.02.2014   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  28.02.2014   
James Poole Limited
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014   
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Richter, Carsten
Postfach 11 38
23501 Lübeck / DE
10.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1608/16
06.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1608/16
05.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2017/37]
Former [2017/04]HU19.12.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IT19.12.2015
Former [2015/41]HU19.12.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2015/34]HU19.12.2008
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2015/30]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE19.12.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU19.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU19.12.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0887424  (KAINOS LAB INC [JP]) [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * page 3, lines 36-39; figure 7 *;
 [Y]WO2006111028  (UTI LIMITED PARTNERSHIP [CA]; ZHANG KUNYAN [CA]; CONLY JOHN [CA]) [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * example 5; table 2 *;
 [Y]US2007054296  (PIEPENBURG OLAF [GB] ET AL) [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * paragraphs [0096] - [0097]; figure 10 *;
 [E]WO2009018000  (QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INVEST INC [US]; MCCARTHY LARRY [US]; KONG LILLY [US) [E] 4,6-8,10-12,18 * claims 1,8,9,16,20 *;
 [XP]WO2008129428  (MOLECULAR DETECTION INC [IL]; PAITAN YOSEF [IL]) [XP] 4,6-8,10-12,18 * paragraph [0024]; example 1; claims 1,3 *
 [A]  - HOLFELDER M ET AL, "Direct detection of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus in clinical specimens by a nucleic acid-based hybridisation assay", CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTION, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UNITED KINGDOM, SWITZERLAND, vol. 12, no. 12, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1469-0691.2006.01547.X, ISSN 1198-743X, (20061201), pages 1163 - 1167, (20060807), XP002610875 [A] 1-32 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-0691.2006.01547.x
 [Y]  - ZHANG K Y ET AL, "Novel multiplex PCR assay for characterization and concomitant subtyping of staphylococcal cassette chromosome mec types I to V in methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20051001), vol. 43, no. 10, doi:DOI:10.1128/JCM.43.10.5026-5033.2005, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 5026 - 5033, XP003003504 [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * page 5027, column 2, paragraph 3; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.43.10.5026-5033.2005
 [Y]  - CUNY C ET AL, "PCR for the identification of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MRSA) strains using a single primer pair specific for SCCmec elements and the neighbouring chromosome-borne orfX", CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTION, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UNITED KINGDOM, SWITZERLAND, (20051001), vol. 11, no. 10, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1469-0691.2005.01236.X, ISSN 1198-743X, pages 834 - 837, XP002451789 [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-0691.2005.01236.x
 [Y]  - HULETSKY A ET AL, "New real-time PCR assay for rapid detection of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus directly from specimens containing a mixture of staphylococci", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040501), vol. 42, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1128/JCM.42.5.1875-1884.2004, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1875 - 1884, XP003003502 [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.5.1875-1884.2004
 [Y]  - HAGEN R M ET AL, "Development of a real-time PCR assay for rapid identification of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus from clinical samples", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, URBAN UND FISCHER, DE, vol. 295, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.IJMM.2004.12.008, ISSN 1438-4221, (20050601), pages 77 - 86, (20050601), XP025339023 [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijmm.2004.12.008
 [Y]  - HULETSKY ANN ET AL, "Identification of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus carriage in less than 1 hour during a hospital surveillance program", CLINICAL INFECTIOUS DISEASES, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO PRESS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20050401), vol. 40, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1086/428579, ISSN 1058-4838, pages 976 - 981, XP002451791 [Y] 4,6-13,15-18 * page 978, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/428579
International search[X]US2007082340  (HULETSKY ANN [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2005019893  (HULETSKY ANN [CA], et al);
 [A]US6379897  (WEIDENHAMMER ELAINE M [US], et al)
by applicantUS4486539
 US4751177
 US5210015
 US5487972
 US5804375
 US5994076
 US4563419
 US4851330
 US2006057613
    - DUNN ET AL., CELL, (1978), vol. 12, pages 23 - 26
    - SAITO ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, pages 2498 - 2500
    - UBUKATA ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1992), vol. 30, pages 1728 - 1733
    - MURAKAMI ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1991), vol. 29, pages 2240 - 2244
    - HIRAMATSU ET AL., MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 36, pages 445 - 453
    - RUPP, J. ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 44, no. 6, page 2317
    - ZHANG ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 43, no. 10, pages 5026 - 5033