Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2242910

EP2242910 - BEARING ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ansaldo Energia S.p.A.
Via Nicola Lorenzi 8
Genova / IT
[2010/43]
Inventor(s)01 / DOTTA, Claudio
Via Teglia 147
I-17044 S. Martino Stella / IT
02 / TRAVERSO, Riccardo
Via Felice del Canto 17/9
I-16154 Genova / IT
03 / MINNITI, Silvia
Via Vianson 18/7
I-16156 Genova / IT
04 / ROSA, Sergio
Via E. Porro 11/10 scala A.
I-16151 Genova / IT
 [2010/43]
Representative(s)Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/23]
Former [2013/12]Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2010/43]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date08868269.529.12.2008
[2010/43]
WO2008IB03642
Priority number, dateIT2007MI0244228.12.2007         Original published format: IT MI20072442
[2010/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009083789
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2242910
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2242910
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:F01D25/16, F01D3/04, F16C17/22, F16C33/10, F16C17/10, F16C25/02
[2010/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/43]
TitleGerman:LAGERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE GASTURBINE[2010/43]
English:BEARING ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE[2010/43]
French:ENSEMBLE PALIER POUR TURBINE À GAZ[2010/43]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2010National basic fee paid 
26.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/43]
28.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2013Fee for grant paid
31.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0637/17
15.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2008
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
GB29.12.2013
IE29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
ES30.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU29.12.2008
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
GB29.12.2013
IE29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
ES30.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/51]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
GB29.12.2013
IE29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
IE29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
Former [2014/37]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
FI29.12.2013
LU29.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
Former [2013/41]HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
Former [2013/38]LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
Former [2013/37]LT20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.03.2013
SE20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.03.2013
NO20.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1479875  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0028424  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [X] 1-13,18 * abstract * * page 6, line 14 - line 15 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]DE805336  (JOSEF WOLFENSTETTER DIPL ING) [X] 1-9,18 * column 1, line 7 - line 8 * * column 2, line 59 - line 62 * * column 2, line 79 - line 81 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2449820  (WALLACE MURRAY CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,18 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - line 22 * * page 6, line 15 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]SU1370336  (CH G SOYUZNOGO NI TRAKTORNOGO [SU]) [X] 1-3,18 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5363557  (THOMPSON RONALD J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,18 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 43 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0028190  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; REICHERT ARND [DE]; BECKER BERNARD [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *