Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2229644

EP2229644 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REFINING SIMILAR CASE SEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2010/38]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BOROCZKY, Lilla
P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road
Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US
02 / AGNIHOTRI, Lalitha
P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarbarough Road
Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US
03 / ZHAO, Luyin
P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarbarough Road
Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US
04 / LEE, Michael
P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarbarough Road
Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US
 [2010/38]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/38]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date08868858.510.12.2008
[2010/38]
WO2008IB55204
Priority number, dateUS2007001692827.12.2007         Original published format: US 16928
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009083841
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2229644
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2010/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFEINERUNG DER SUCHE NACH ÄHNLICHEN FÄLLEN[2010/38]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REFINING SIMILAR CASE SEARCH[2010/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AFFINER UNE RECHERCHE DE CAS SIMILAIRE[2010/38]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2010National basic fee paid 
27.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
24.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination02.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1091/17
12.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.11.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]US7272593  (CASTELLI VITTORIO [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - IGOR JURISICA ET AL, "Incremental Iterative Retrieval and Browsing for Efficient Conversational CBR Systems", APPLIED INTELLIGENCE ; THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ARTIFICIALINTELLIGENCE, NEURAL NETWORKS, AND COMPLEX PROBLEM-SOLVING TE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20000501), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1573-7497, pages 251 - 268, XP019204460 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008375309626
 [X]  - THOMAS M DESERNO ET AL, "Extended Query Refinement for Medical Image Retrieval", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING ; THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20070512), vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 1618-727X, pages 280 - 289, XP019596196 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MULLER H ET AL, "A review of content-based image retrieval systems in medical applications-clinical benefits and future directions", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL INFORMATICS, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SHANNON, IR, (20040201), vol. 73, no. 1, ISSN 1386-5056, pages 1 - 23, XP004492601 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijmedinf.2003.11.024
 [X]  - HUNG ET AL, "Mammographic case base applied for supporting image diagnosis of breast lesion", EXPERT SYSTEMS WITH APPLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (20060101), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0957-4174, pages 93 - 108, XP005168924 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eswa.2005.09.067