Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2231016

EP2231016 - APPARATUS OF CONE BEAM CT IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/39]THE METHODS AND APPARATUS OF CONE BEAM CT IMAGING AND IMAGE-GUIDED PROCEDURES
[2015/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koning Corporation
Lennox Tech Enterprise Center 150 Lucius Gordon Drive Suite 112
West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US
[2016/14]
Former [2010/39]For all designated states
Koning Corporation
Lennox Tech Enterprise Center 150 Lucius Gordon Drive Suite 112
West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NING, Ruola
28 Chadwick Manor
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
02 / CONOVER, David L.
134 Kimbrook Drive
Rochester, NY 14612 / US
03 / YU, Yong
4 Charing Cross
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
 [2016/14]
Former [2010/51]01 / NING, Ruola
28 Chadwick Manor
Fairport NY 14450 / US
02 / CONOVER, David L.
134 Kimbrook Drive
Rochester, NY 14612 / US
03 / YU, Yong
4 Charing Cross
Fairport NY 14450 / US
Former [2010/39]01 / NING, Ruola
28 Chadwick Manor
Fairport NY 14450 / US
02 / CONOVER, David, L.
71 Howedale Drive
Rochester NY 14616 / US
03 / YU, Yong
4 Charing Cross
Fairport NY 14450 / US
Representative(s)inCompass IP Europe Limited
51 Paddock Mead
Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/14]inCompass IP Europe Limited
4 Bloomsbury Place
London WC1A 2QA / GB
Former [2014/24]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
26 Mallinson Road
London SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2013/25]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London
W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2011/12]Hill, Justin John , et al
Ipulse (IP) Ltd. 9-10 Savile Row
London W1S 3PF / GB
Former [2010/39]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08869216.522.12.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US88079
Priority number, dateUS20070016030P21.12.2007         Original published format: US 16030 P
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009086332
Date:09.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2231016
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2231016
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, A61B90/00, G06T11/00, A61B6/12, A61B6/04, A61B6/03, // A61B10/02
[2016/12]
Former International [2015/38]A61B6/00, A61B19/00, G06T11/00, A61B6/12, A61B6/04, A61B6/03, // A61B10/02
Former International [2011/46]A61B6/00, A61B19/00, // A61B10/02
Former International [2010/39]A61B6/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2010/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR 3D-COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIE[2015/38]
English:APPARATUS OF CONE BEAM CT IMAGING[2015/38]
French:APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE CT DE FAISCEAU DE CÔNE[2015/38]
Former [2010/39]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR 3D-COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIE UND BILDGEFÜHRTE EINGRIFFE
Former [2010/39]THE METHODS AND APPARATUS OF CONE BEAM CT IMAGING AND IMAGE-GUIDED PROCEDURES
Former [2010/39]PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE CT DE FAISCEAU DE CÔNE ET PROCÉDURES GUIDÉES PAR IMAGE
Entry into regional phase01.07.2010National basic fee paid 
01.07.2010Search fee paid 
01.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
14.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Fee for grant paid
25.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2013
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2008
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE22.12.2016
LU22.12.2016
MT22.12.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/38]HU22.12.2008
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE22.12.2016
LU22.12.2016
Former [2018/29]HU22.12.2008
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE22.12.2016
LU22.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU22.12.2008
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE22.12.2016
LU22.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE22.12.2016
LU22.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]LT06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6258104  (KREIZMAN ALEXANDER S [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 25; figures 1,2,4A-5B *;
 [Y]US2006094950  (NING RUOLA [US]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0129] , [0136] *;
 [Y]US5595177  (MENA ISMAEL [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * column 7, lines 1-26 *;
 [A]US2007270687  (GARDI LORI A [CA], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0048] *;
 [A]DE102005012985  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0025] *
International search[X]US6258104  (KREIZMAN ALEXANDER S [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007270687  (GARDI LORI A [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2006094950  (NING RUOLA [US]);
 [Y]US5595177  (MENA ISMAEL [US], et al)
ExaminationWO2007141784
 US2002156365
 WO2006119426
by applicantUS6258104