Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2249653

EP2249653 - ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SmartWash Solutions, LLC.
1129 Harkins Road
Salinas, CA 93901 / US
[2013/44]
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
New Leaf Food Safety Solutions, LLC
1129 Harkins Road
Salinas, CA 93901 / US
Former [2010/46]For all designated states
Taylor Fresh Foods, Inc
911-B Blanco Circle
Salinas, CA 93901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEMMONS, Kel, Eugene
4686 Chrome Ridge Court
Placerville CA 95667 / US
 [2010/46]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/46]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date08872228.502.10.2008
[2010/46]
WO2008US11392
Priority number, dateUS20080024558P30.01.2008         Original published format: US 24558 P
US2008024346001.10.2008         Original published format: US 243460
[2010/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009099419
Date:13.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2249653
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01P1/00, A01P3/00, A01P5/00, A01N31/02, A01N31/14, A01N37/02, A01N37/36, A01N41/02, A01N59/00, A01N59/26, A61L2/00
[2010/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2010/46]
English:ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2010/46]
French:COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2010National basic fee paid 
19.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
24.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1725/17
26.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
05.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
08.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[E]WO2009037231  (ASEPTIX TECHNOLOGIES B V [NL]; BOBBERT ILJA [NL]) [E] 1-120 * pages 18-22 * * claims 1-17 *;
 [XD]US5569461  (ANDREWS JEFFREY F [US]) [XD] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-7 *;
 [XD]WO8912469  (FAERGEMANN JAN [SE]; LARKOE OLLE [SE]) [XD] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-9 * * table 1 *;
 [X]US6699907  (DEE ALEJANDRO [US] ET AL) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-3 * * examples 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0244144  (KABARA JON JOSEPH) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0530861  (KABARA JON JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-12 * * examples 1-6 *;
 [X]US4938953  (PENA LORRAINE E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]FR2851161  (VINCIENCE [FR]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-14 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]US5017612  (NAYFA JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-10 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]WO02059244  (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-38 * * examples 2-6 *;
 [X]WO0008929  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]; SELMER OLSEN INGVAR [NO]; HJOERNEVIK LEIF [NO]; J) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-4 * * example 1 *;
 [X]EP0251303  (KRUEGER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claim 5 * * example 1 *;
 [X]DE19850994  (MENNO CHEMIE VERTRIEBSGES M B [DE]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-8 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [X]WO9507616  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-32,47-55,58-62,68-120 * claims 1-9 * * Formulations 1-22 *;
 [X]EP0801897  (UNIPROX B V [NL]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-10 * * page 5, lines 41-44 *;
 [X]WO8504107  (ALCIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-30 * * page 10, paragraph 3; example 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 *;
 [X]WO9304595  (KON DES MILIEUTECHNOLOGIE B V [NL]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-13 * * page 2, line 13 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [X]DE102005024001  (SCHNEIDERS JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-18 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] *;
 [X]US6080417  (KRAMER AXEL [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1-7 *;
 [X]WO9811777  (COTTRELL LTD [US]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-6,16 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [X]WO0013656  (AHMED FAHIM Y [US]) [X] 1-120 * tables 1-3,5-9,11-14 *;
 [X]EP1685854  (BRAUN MEDICAL AG [CH]) [X] 1-120 * examples 2-9 * * claims 1-28 *;
 [X]US2002094941  (SCHULHOFF JEFFREY [US] ET AL) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-15 *;
 [X]WO2005070205  (ECOLAB INC [US]; MAN VICTOR F [US]; LENTSCH STEVEN E [US]; MAGNUSON JO) [X] 1-120 * claims 11,12,21,22,58,119 *;
 [X]WO0207520  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [X] 1-120 * examples 1-6; tables I-III *;
 [X]WO2004045281  (VIROX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]; RAMIREZ JOSE A [US]; OMIDBAKHSH NAVID [CA) [X] 1-120 * claim 31 * * page 32; table Xa *;
 [X]EP1876225  (CENTENNIAL VENTURES BV [NL]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-10 * * table 1 * * paragraph [0056] *;
 [X]EP0953283  (FARMEC S N C DI TABASSO RENATO [IT] NUOVA FARMEC S R L [IT]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-28 *;
 [X]GB2319179  (RECKITT & COLMAN INC [US]) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-10 * * tables 1-2 *;
 [X]US6106774  (MONTICELLO MICHAEL VINCENT [US] ET AL) [X] 1-120 * claims 1-21 * * examples 1-20 *