Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2259998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011005506Global Dossier 13.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20080629 09.04.2008
WO2008IT00532 04.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2259998Global Dossier 15.12.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20080629 09.04.2008
WO2008IT00532 04.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009125444Global Dossier 15.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20080629 09.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITMI20080629 10.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20080629 09.04.2008