Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2259998

EP2259998 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT NICKEL AND HYDROGEN EXOTHERMAL REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
[2012/11]
Former [2010/50]For all designated states
Pascucci Maddalena
Via Ezio 24
00192 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / ROSSI, Andrea
C/o Pascucci Maddalena Via Ezio 24
1-00192 Roma / IT
 [2010/50]
Representative(s)Rastelli, Franco , et al
Dott. Franco Cicogna & C. SRL
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08873805.904.08.2008
[2010/50]
WO2008IT00532
Priority number, dateIT2008MI0062909.04.2008         Original published format: IT MI20080629
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009125444
Date:15.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2259998
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009
[2010/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/00, C01B6/02
[2010/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON EXOTHERMEN REAKTIONEN ZWISCHEN NICKEL UND WASSERSTOFF[2010/50]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT NICKEL AND HYDROGEN EXOTHERMAL REACTIONS[2010/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RÉALISER DES RÉACTIONS EXOTHERMIQUES ENTRE LE NICKEL ET L'HYDROGÈNE[2010/50]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2010National basic fee paid 
16.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/50]
17.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2011Observations by third parties
29.04.2011Observations by third parties
25.06.2012Observations by third parties
19.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2017Observations by third parties
01.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/31]
27.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1551032  (OSAKA IND PROMOTION ORG [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0043] , [0046] , [0064] , [0073]; figure 4; example 1; claims 1,4,7 * [Y] 2,6,9-12,15;
 [Y]  - E. CAMPARI, S. FOCARDI, V. GABBANI, V. MONTALBANO, F. PIANTELLI, S. VERONESI, "Overview of H_Ni systems: old experiments and new setup", 5TH ASTI WORKSHOP ON ANOMALIES IN HYDROGEN-DEUTERIUM LOADED METALS, ASTI, ITALY, (2004), XP002517911 [Y] 2,6,11,12,15 * figures 1,2,9; table 1 *
 [Y]  - S. FOCARDI, V. GABBANI, V. MONTALBANO, F. PIANTELLI, S. VERONESI, "Evidence of Electromagnetic radiation from Ni-H Systems", 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONDENSED MATTER NUCLEAR SCIENCE 2004, MARSEILLE, FRANCE, (2004), XP002517912 [Y] 2,6,9-12 * figure 2 *
 [A]  - CERRON-ZEBALLOS E ET AL, "INVESTIGATION OF ANOMALOUS HEAT PRODUCTION IN NI-H SYSTEMS", SOCIETA ITALIANA DI FISICA, NUOVO CIMENTO A, EDITRICE COMPOSITORI, BOLOGNA, IT, (19961201), vol. 109A, no. 12, ISSN 0369-3546, pages 1645 - 1654, XP008103248 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - G. MENGOLI, M. BERNARDINI, C. MANDUCHI, G. ZANNONI, "Anomalous heat effects correlated with electrochemical hydriding of nickel", IL NUOVO CIMENTO, (1998), vol. 20D, no. 3, pages 331 - 352, XP002517910 [A] 1-15 * page 332 *
otherWO9520816
    - LEWAN MATS, "Cold fusion may provide one megawatt in Athens", INTERNET CITATION, (20110202), URL: http://www.nyteknik.se/nyheter/energi_miljo/energi/article3081694.ece, XP003027505
    - KIM Y.E., "Nuclear Reactions in Micro/Nano-Scale Metal Particles", PROCEEDINGS OF APFB, SEOUL, S. KOREA, (2011), pages 1 - 8, XP003030826

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00601-012-0374-6
    - WIDOM A.; LARSEN L., "Ultra low momentum neutron catalyzed nuclear reactions on metallic hydride surfaces", THE EUROPEAN PHYSICAL JOURNAL C ; PARTICLES AND FIELDS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060401), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 107 - 111, XP019355052

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1140/epjc/s2006-02479-8
    - SRINIVASAN MAHADEVA, "Cold Fusion, Poised to become an industrial Reality", SCIENCE REPORTER, (201107), pages 26 - 30, XP003030827