Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2307938

EP2307938 - FLOW CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Belparts
Wingepark 4
3110 Rotselaar / BE
[2011/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ULENS, Jan
Dennenlaan 31a
B-3120 Tremelo / BE
02 / VANDENHEUVEL, Philip
Private Weg 11
B-1980 Hofstade / BE
03 / VANDENDRIESSCHE, Peter
Hoekje 4
B-3221 Nieuwrode / BE
 [2011/15]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/15]Sarlet, Steven Renaat Irène , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date08874783.722.12.2008
[2011/15]
WO2008EP68188
Priority number, dateBE2008000035426.06.2008         Original published format: BE 200800354
[2011/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009156010
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2307938
Date:13.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2307938
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:F24D19/10, G05D7/06, E03B7/00, E03B7/08, E03B7/07
[2012/50]
Former International [2011/15]G05D7/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/15]
TitleGerman:FLUSSSTEUERSYSTEM[2011/15]
English:FLOW CONTROL SYSTEM[2011/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT[2011/15]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2011National basic fee paid 
26.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/15]
29.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2012
21.11.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2013Fee for grant paid
02.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13182175.3  / EP2706425
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.07.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BELIMO Holding AG
Brunnenbachstrasse 1
8340 Hinwil / CH
Opponent's representative
Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2014/33]
Opponent(s)01  03.07.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BELIMO Holding AG
Brunnenbachstrasse 1
8340 Hinwil / CH
Opponent's representative
Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
22.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.05.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1672/16
20.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
CZ22.12.2018
FI22.12.2018
IE22.12.2018
SK22.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
PT24.06.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
CZ22.12.2018
FI22.12.2018
IE22.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
PT24.06.2019
Former [2019/47]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
CZ22.12.2018
FI22.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
PT24.06.2019
Former [2019/35]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
CZ22.12.2018
FI22.12.2018
PT24.06.2019
Former [2019/33]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
FI22.12.2018
PT24.06.2019
Former [2016/28]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
Former [2015/41]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
GR16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2015/38]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
GR16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2015/34]HU22.12.2008
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2015/14]CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/38]CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/37]CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/25]HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/23]HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT16.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2008029174  (YOSHINO KENRO [JP]) [X] 1-6,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0082] - [0087]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0093] - [0105]; figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0149] - [0154]; figures 8,9 * [Y] 7-18,20;
 [Y]WO2008039065  (KAMSTRUP B V [NL], et al) [Y] 7,12,13,16-18,20 * abstract * * page 11, line 21 - page 13, line 35; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE102006028178  (BIEDERMANN ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 8-11 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2002040733  (BALAZY RICHARD D [US], et al) [Y] 7,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0010] , [0017] - [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figure 4 *
Examination   - SIPAHI R ET AL, "Stability and Stabilization of Systems with Time Delay", IEEE CONTROL SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, (20110201), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MCS.2010.939135, ISSN 1066-033X, pages 38 - 65, XP011372720

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCS.2010.939135
by applicantWO2008039065