blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2374219

EP2374219 - A METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTED MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, IS
published on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2015/24]
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Piazza degli Affari 2
20123 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BOLDI, Mauro
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
02 / GIANOLA, Paolo
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
03 / MELIS, Bruno
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
04 / RUSCITTO, Alfredo
Strada dei Tadini 23/20
I-10131 Torino / IT
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al
Marchi & Partners S.r.l.
Via Vittor Pisani, 13
20124 Milano / IT
[2018/14]
Former [2011/41]Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al
MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08875131.830.12.2008
[2018/14]
WO2008EP11138
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2010075864
Date:08.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2374219
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2374219
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/02, H04W88/08
[2011/41]
CPC:
H04B7/022 (EP,BR,US); H04B7/0617 (US); H04W4/18 (EP,BR,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,BR,US); H04W92/10 (EP,BR,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR VERTEILTE MOBILKOMMUNIKATION, ENTSPRECHENDES SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2011/41]
English:A METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTED MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2011/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES RÉPARTIES, SYSTÈME AFFÉRENT ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE[2011/41]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2011National basic fee paid 
06.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
26.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2018Fee for grant paid
19.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.08.2014
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.12.2008
AT04.04.2018
CY04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
TR04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
IS04.08.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
MT30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
[2020/32]
Former [2020/30]HU30.12.2008
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
TR04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
MT30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/16]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
TR04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
MT30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/08]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
MT30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/04]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2019/51]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
Former [2019/48]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE30.12.2018
LU30.12.2018
Former [2019/40]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU30.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU30.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007059496  (NEOCIFIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0031] - [0033] - [0040] , [0044] , [0046] - [0048] - [0051] *
ExaminationUS2007072646
 US2006217158
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.