Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2346744

EP2346744 - NUTRITIVE SUBSTANCE DELIVERY CONTAINER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/30]NUTRITIVE SUBSTANCE DELIVERY CONTAINER
[2013/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MJN U.S. Holdings LLC
225 North Canal Street
25th Floor
Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US
[2017/50]
Former [2013/35]For all designated states
MJN U.S. Holdings LLC
2701 Patriot Boulevard
4th Floor
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
2400 West Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIGGINS, Robin P.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company
2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
02 / GRELEWICZ, Rick
c/o Mead Johnson&Company
2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
03 / RANGAVAJLA, Nagendra
c/o Mead Johnson&Company
2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
04 / ANTHONY, Joshua C.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company
2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
05 / MCCALLISTER, Patrick E.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company
2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
 [2013/27]
Former [2011/30]01 / WIGGINS, Robin P.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company 2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
02 / GRELEWICZ, Rick
c/o Mead Johnson&Company 2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
03 / RANGAVAJLA, Nagendra
c/o Mead Johnson&Company 2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
04 / ANTHONY, Joshua C.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company 2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
05 / MCCALLISTER, Patrick E.
c/o Mead Johnson&Company 2400 W Lloyd Expressway
Evansville, Indiana 47721 / US
Representative(s)Cawdell, Karen Teresa , et al
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2011/30]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08876438.603.11.2008
[2011/30]
WO2008US82188
Priority number, dateUS2008025058814.10.2008         Original published format: US 250588
[2011/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010044805
Date:22.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2346744
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010
[2011/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2346744
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:B65D23/04, B65D81/32, B65D83/68, B65D51/28, B65D51/22
[2016/17]
Former International [2011/30]B65D51/28, B65D51/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NÄHRSTOFFABGABEBEHÄLTER UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN[2013/04]
English:NUTRITIVE SUBSTANCE DELIVERY CONTAINER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD[2013/04]
French:CONTENANT DE DISTRIBUTION DE SUBSTANCE NUTRITIVE ET METHOD CORRESPONDANTE[2013/04]
Former [2011/30]NÄHRSTOFFABGABEBEHÄLTER
Former [2011/30]NUTRITIVE SUBSTANCE DELIVERY CONTAINER
Former [2011/30]CONTENANT DE DISTRIBUTION DE SUBSTANCE NUTRITIVE
Entry into regional phase13.04.2011National basic fee paid 
13.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
02.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2013Fee for grant paid
21.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.04.2014  11.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2016/39]
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2014   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O.Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
08.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
10.06.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition25.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1963/16
02.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2008
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IE03.11.2013
IS03.11.2013
LU03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU03.11.2008
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IE03.11.2013
IS03.11.2013
LU03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2015/32]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IE03.11.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IE03.11.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY26.06.2013
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY26.06.2013
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI03.07.2013
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2007029214  (BALAZIK RONALD F [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 7-8 [I] 9-15;
 [X]US2002179461  (MOLLSTAM BO [SE], et al) [X] 1-2 * paragraph [0034]; figures 5-6 *;
 [Y]US4682702  (GACH PETER P [US]) [Y] 7-8 * column 3, line 33 - line 48; figures 1-4 *