Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2229424

EP2229424 - SURFACE-MODIFIED CONVERSION LUMINOUS SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2010/38]
Inventor(s)01 / PETRY, Ralf
Mozartstrasse 8A
64347 Griesheim / DE
02 / RUEGER, Reinhold
Schillerstrasse 11
63322 Roedermark / DE
03 / VOSGROENE, Tim
Claude-Monet-Weg 22
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
04 / WINKLER, Holger
Lily-Pringsheim-Weg 17
64291 Darmstadt / DE
 [2010/45]
Former [2010/38]01 / PETRY, Ralf
Mozartstrasse 8A
64347 Griesheim / DE
02 / RUEGER, Reinhold
Schillerstrasse 11
63322 Roedermark / DE
03 / VOSGROENE, Tim
Waldmuehlenweg 9
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
04 / WINKLER, Holger
Lily-Pringsheim-Weg 17
64291 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date08876948.429.10.2008
[2010/38]
WO2008EP09142
Priority number, dateDE2007105634222.11.2007         Original published format: DE102007056342
[2010/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010060437
Date:03.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2229424
Date:22.09.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010
[2010/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2229424
Date:21.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/02, C09K11/80, C09K11/59, // H01L33/50
[2015/30]
Former International [2010/38]C09K11/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2010/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTE KONVERSIONSLEUCHTSTOFFE[2010/38]
English:SURFACE-MODIFIED CONVERSION LUMINOUS SUBSTANCES[2010/38]
French:SUBSTANCES LUMINESCENTES DE CONVERSION À SURFACE MODIFIÉE[2010/38]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2010National basic fee paid 
28.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
10.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2015Fee for grant paid
07.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2014
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.10.2008
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
AT29.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
LU29.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]HU29.10.2008
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
AT29.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2017/18]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
AT29.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE29.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/33]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES21.10.2015
IT21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH09279137  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; claim 5 * * Ausführungsbeispiele * [Y] 2-4,6-19;
 [XY]US4921727  (DATTA PABITRA [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * claims 1-2 * * examples 1-5 * * column 1 * [Y] 2-4,6-19;
 [XY]US6177030  (SHOJI TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * claim 1 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 40 * * examples 1-3 * [Y] 2-4,6-19;
 [XA]US2003098644  (THOMAS ALAN C [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 2-19;
 [XY]JP2005330490  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [X] 1,5 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 2-4,6-19;
 [A]  - SCHLOTTER P ET AL, "Fabrication and characterization of GaN/InGaN/AlGaN double heterostructure LEDs and their application in luminescence conversion LEDs", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0921-5107(98)00352-3, (19990506), vol. 59, no. 1-3, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 390 - 394, XP004173273 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(98)00352-3
ExaminationUS2004135121
 US2002105266