Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2344104 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2344104



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 606
29.03.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.03.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
19.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.03.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 4
19.03.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 5
19.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.02.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
08.02.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
08.02.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
30.01.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 33
16.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
16.10.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
16.08.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.08.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 3
08.08.2017 Description Opposition 23
08.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.08.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.08.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
24.03.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.03.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
12.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.07.2016 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.07.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
18.03.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.03.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.02.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
11.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.05.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
07.04.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.12.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.12.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
13.11.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Description Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.11.2014 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
30.07.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.07.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
17.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.06.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.05.2011 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
11.05.2011 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
28.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
14.03.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.03.2011 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2011 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.10.2010 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
13.09.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
13.09.2010 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.09.2010 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.09.2010 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
01.09.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.07.2010 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.05.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46