Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2342082

EP2342082 - THERMAL FLUID-EJECTION DEVICE DIE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2011/28]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN BROCKLIN, Andrew L.
1000 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US
02 / BAKKER, Chris
1000 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US
03 / HUNTER, Mark
1000 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US
04 / MARTIN, Eric
1000 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US
 [2011/28]
Representative(s)Stöckeler, Ferdinand , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Stöckeler, Ferdinand , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Former [2011/28]Stöckeler, Ferdinand , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date08877892.331.10.2008
[2011/28]
WO2008US82112
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010050977
Date:06.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2342082
Date:13.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010
[2011/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2342082
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/05, B41J2/01
[2011/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIP FÜR EINE THERMISCHE FLUIDAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG[2011/28]
English:THERMAL FLUID-EJECTION DEVICE DIE[2011/28]
French:MATRICE POUR DISPOSITIF THERMIQUE D ÉJECTION DE FLUIDE[2011/28]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2011National basic fee paid 
12.04.2011Search fee paid 
12.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
02.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2013Fee for grant paid
06.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2013
Opposition(s)19.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.10.2008
AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
IT18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
MT18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
TR18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU31.10.2008
AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
IT18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
TR18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2016/29]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
IT18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2016/28]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2016/25]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2015/27]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2015/24]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/39]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT18.12.2013
BE18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/36]BE18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
Former [2014/34]BE18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT18.12.2013
NO18.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005157088  (HIRAYAMA NOBUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0166] * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0131] * * figure 5 *
International search[Y]US4972202  (KOMURA, H. ET AL.);
 [Y]US6299292  (EDWARDS, M. J.);
 [A]JPH0269259  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]US5150129  (HARA, T. ET AL.);
 [A]US5674014  (JORDAN, J. D.)