Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2042227

EP2042227 - EMISSION TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD USING A SCR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/14]Emission treatment system and method using a scr filter
[2015/26]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
[2011/01]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
BASF Catalysts LLC
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
ENGELHARD CORPORATION
101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770
Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Patchett, Joseph, Allan
46 Queen Anne Drive
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
02 / Dettling, Joseph Charles
8 Spicey Pond Road
Howell, NJ 07731 / US
03 / Przybylski, Elizabeth, Alina
188 Evergreen Road. 4B
Edison, NJ 08837 / US
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB , et al
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Howard, Paul Nicholas , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/14]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date09000346.830.07.2004
[2009/14]
Priority number, dateUS2003063465905.08.2003         Original published format: US 634659
[2009/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2042227
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2042227
Date:24.02.2010
[2010/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2042227
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, F01N3/20, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, F01N3/28, B01J29/76, F01N3/10, F01N3/023, F01N13/00
[2015/26]
Former International [2009/14]B01D53/94, F01N3/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2009/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:EMISSIONSBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN VERWENDEND EINEN SCR-FILTER[2015/26]
English:EMISSION TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD USING A SCR FILTER[2015/26]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉMISSIONS UTILISANT UN FILTRE A RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE (SCR)[2015/26]
Former [2009/14]Emissionsbehandlungssystem und einen SCR-Filter verwendendes Verfahren
Former [2009/14]Emission treatment system and method using a scr filter
Former [2009/14]Système de traitement d'émissions et procède d'utilisation d'un filtre a réduction catalytique sélective (SCR)
Examination procedure24.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
16.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
21.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2013Observations by third parties
05.06.2013Observations by third parties
19.09.2014Observations by third parties
10.04.2015Observations by third parties
23.04.2015Observations by third parties
24.04.2015Observations by third parties
06.05.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2015
07.05.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.05.2015Observations by third parties
02.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2015Fee for grant paid
15.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04779814.5  / EP1663458
Divisional application(s)EP15161517.6  / EP2933009
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040779814) is  04.09.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015  12.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  04.03.2016  31.08.2016  WITHDRAWN
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015  12.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  04.03.2016  31.08.2016  WITHDRAWN
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2016/16]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015  12.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  04.03.2016  16.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2015/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015   
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
09.06.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0056/18
27.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
25.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.04.2013Request for further processing filed
02.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.04.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2004
AT29.07.2015
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
IE30.07.2015
LU30.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]HU30.07.2004
AT29.07.2015
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
IE30.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/36]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
IE30.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/33]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
IE30.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/23]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI29.07.2015
GR30.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0393917  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 5-7 * page 1, lines 1-3,43-53 * * page 3, lines 1-3 * * page 4, lines 50-53 * * table 2 * * claims 1,4 *;
 [X]EP0800856  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 8,9,11 * page 2, lines 3-6,49-51 * * example B1 * * claims 1,7 *;
 [Y]WO03054364  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4,10 * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 11 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 11 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,4,14,16,31,32,56,62-66 *;
 [Y]EP1298112  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0012] * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US2003044520  (KIESSLING RALPH [DE], et al) [X] 12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0012] , [0023] , [0042] , [0043] , [0060] * * figures 4,5 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH03130522  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4,10 * abstract *
Examination   - S. HASHIMOTO, Y. MIYAIRI, T. HAMANAKA, R. MATSUBARA, T. HARADA, S. MIWA, "SiC and Cordierite Diesel Particulate Filters Designed for Low Pressure Drop and Catalyzed, Uncatalyzed Systems", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, Warrendale, PA, USA, (20020304), no. 2002-01-0322, ISSN 0148-7191, pages 1 - 14
by applicantJPH03130522
 US4912776
 WO9939809
 WO0112320
 US4961917
 US4329162
 US4963332
 US5522218
 US6415602
 US5100632
 US5491120
 US5462907
 US5516497
    - "Durability Driving Schedule for Light Duty Vehicles and Light Duty Trucks", CODE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS, vol. 86, pages 836 - 01
otherUS7902107
 US7229597
 WO03054364
    - BAERLOCHER C.H., ATLAS OF ZEOLITE FRAMEWORK TYPES, (2001), pages 1 - 2, 4, 7, 22, XP003032355
    - HECK R. M. ET AL, "Reduction of No.", CATALYTIC AIR POLLUTION CONTROL COMMERCIAL TECHNOLOGY. SECOND EDITION., (20090101), vol. 2, pages 310 - 315, XP003032356
Opposition   - KASAI et al., "New Cordierite Diesel Particulate Filter Material for the Diesel Particulate - NOx Reduction System", SAE Technical Paper 2004-01-09 53
    - PEREDA-AYO et al., "Influence of the washcoat characteristics on NH3-SCR behaviour of Cu- zeolite monoliths", Catalysis Today, (20130000), vol. 216, pages 82 - 89, XP028707215

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2013.06.012
    - "Experiments to show how the viscosity of copper zeolite SCR catalyst composition affects the resulting back pressure", Annex 1 - Rheology Modifier Study
    - Annex 2 - Letter of response dated 18 April 2016 filed on behalf of BASF Corporation on European patent application, EP 2933009 A1 .