Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2063219


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.07.2017 Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
30.06.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
27.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.06.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
04.04.2017 Change: Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.10.2013 Change: Appeal number
06.09.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
12.06.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.06.2013 New entry: Appeal number
23.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
30.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.06.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.04.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.12.2010 First examination report published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
27.01.2010 Change: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  03.02.2010  [2010/05]
18.08.2009 Amendment by applicant
24.04.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.05.2009  [2009/22]
24.04.2009 Request for examination filed published on  27.05.2009  [2009/22]
13.02.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid