Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2063219

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure23.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
Appeal following examination11.06.2013APPEAL FILED
03.09.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
22.06.2017APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20090204
 
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1020703
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:03.02.2010 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2011 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20101207