Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2063219

EP2063219 - Measurement of hot container wall thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2011
Database last updated on 19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2017Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC.
Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way
Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US
[2009/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Juvinall, John W.
9200 Head-O-Lake Road
Ottawa Lake, MI 49267 / US
02 / Ringlien, James A.
2210 Glenview Drive
Maumee, OH 43537 / US
 [2009/22]
Representative(s)Mergel, Volker
Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[2009/22]
Application number, filing date09000629.710.01.2000
[2009/22]
Priority number, dateUS1999022962812.01.1999         Original published format: US 229628
[2009/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2063219
Date:27.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/22]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/06, G01B21/08
[2009/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/22]
TitleGerman:Messung der Wanddicke von Heißbehältern[2009/22]
English:Measurement of hot container wall thickness[2009/22]
French:Mesure de l'épaisseur de paroi de conteneur chaud[2009/22]
Examination procedure04.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
13.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination11.06.2013Appeal received No.  T2092/13
03.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
22.06.2017Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
22.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.06.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00100472.0  / EP1020703
Divisional application(s)EP17177149.6   Application withdrawn  : 27.06.2017
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000100472) is  14.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]US3535522  (GREEN EDWARD HART) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 13 - column 5, line 37; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0643297  (TCE CONSULTANCY & ENG [NL]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 27 - column 9, line 36; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH05142172  ;
 [A]GB1098122  (STEINKOHLENBERGWERKE MATHIAS STINNES AG) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 97 - line 126; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]US3356212  (LANDIN JACK T) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930920), vol. 017, no. 522, Database accession no. (P - 1616), [A] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantUS2915638
 US3356212
 EP1020703