Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2090915

EP2090915 - Imaging lens and imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2011/35]
Former [2009/34]For all designated states
Fujinon Corporation
1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi
Saitama / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinohara, Yoshikazu
c/o Fujinon Corporation
1-324, Uetake-cho
Kita-ku
Saitama-shi Saitama / JP
 [2012/18]
Former [2009/34]01 / Shinohara, Yoshikazu
c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324, Uetake-cho Kita-ku
Saitama-shi Saitama / JP
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2009/34]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date09001046.326.01.2009
[2009/34]
Priority number, dateJP2008003339614.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008033396
[2009/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2090915
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2090915
Date:02.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02B13/00, G02B13/18, G02B9/34
[2009/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/34]
TitleGerman:Abbildungslinse und Abbildungsvorrichtung[2009/34]
English:Imaging lens and imaging apparatus[2009/34]
French:Lentille d'imagerie et appareil d'imagerie[2009/34]
Examination procedure26.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
18.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2012Fee for grant paid
20.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2010
Opposition(s)05.02.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.01.2009
AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
MK02.05.2012
MT02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
LU26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
MK02.05.2012
MT02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/32]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
MT02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/07]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/51]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
GB26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/50]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/22]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
ES13.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/11]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
IT02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
NL02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT02.05.2012
BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
HR02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
LV02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
GR03.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT02.05.2012
NO02.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP1382985  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [XD] 1-5 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0163] * * tables 1,3,5,7,11,15 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [AD]US2006132933  (NIO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-5 * paragraph [0012] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1868021  (FUJINON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0012] * * example 5 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]JP2002365529  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 13 * * paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]US7321474  (JO SUNG-HO [KR]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 30 - line 50 *
by applicantJP2002228922
 US2002181121
 JP2004053813
 US2006132933
 JP2004102234
 US2004012861