Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2213324

EP2213324 - Patient interface structure and method/tool for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ResMed R&D Germany GmbH
Fraunhoferstrasse 16
82152 Martinsried / DE
[2013/10]
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
MAP Medizin-Technologie GmbH
Fraunhoferstrasse 16
82152 Martinsried / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Biener, Achim
Am Herderfeld 5
85445 Aufkirchen / DE
02 / Lang, Bernd
Jahnstrasse 49
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
 [2010/31]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2016/30]
Former [2010/31]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date09001344.230.01.2009
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2213324
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2213324
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2010/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Patientenschnittstellenstruktur und Verfahren/Werkzeug zu ihrer Herstellung[2010/31]
English:Patient interface structure and method/tool for manufacturing same[2010/31]
French:Structure d'interface de patients et procédé/outil de fabrication associé[2010/31]
Examination procedure30.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/07]
27.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2016Fee for grant paid
10.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2011
Opposition(s)02.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2009
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
GB30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT27.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008106716  (RESMED LTD [AU]; VELISS LEE JAMES [AU]; HARRINGTON CARMEL THERESE [AU]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0152] * * figure 4 * * figure 31 *;
 [X]US2005199239  (LANG BERND [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0070] * * figures 2,4 * * figures 6a,6b,6c * * figure 14 *;
 [X]US2008302365  (COHEN ERIC D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] *;
 [X]WO2004052439  (EMERGENT RESPIRATORY PRODUCTS [US]; GAMBONE ANTHONY JOSEPH [US]; GEE G) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - line 19 * * page 4, line 24 - line 26 * * figures 1,4 *
ExaminationWO2005076874
 DE10352607
 WO2005053781
by applicantWO2007009182
 WO03105921