Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2214122

EP2214122 - Methods and devices for assisting a vehicle driver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[2010/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Platonov, Juri
In der Knackenau 17
82031 Grünwald / DE
02 / Pryakhin, Alexey
Weißkirchner Str. 6
81476 München / DE
03 / Kunath, Peter
Frühaufstrasse 30
80999 München / DE
 [2013/28]
Former [2010/39]01 / Platonov, Juri
In der Knackenau 17
82031 Grünwald / DE
02 / Pryakhin, Alexey
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 58
80689 München / DE
03 / Kunath, Peter
Frühaufstrasse 30
80999 München / DE
Former [2010/31]01 / Platnonov, Juri
In der Knackenau 17
82031 Grünwald / DE
02 / Pryakhin, Alexey
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 58
80689 München / DE
03 / Kunath, Peter
Frühaufstrasse 30
80999 München / DE
Representative(s)Bertsch, Florian Oliver , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/31]Bertsch, Florian Oliver , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date09001443.203.02.2009
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2214122
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2214122
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung eines Fahrzeugfahrers[2010/31]
English:Methods and devices for assisting a vehicle driver[2010/31]
French:Procédés et dispositifs pour aider le conducteur d'un véhicule[2010/31]
Examination procedure04.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/12]
25.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2013Fee for grant paid
31.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2011
Opposition(s)22.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.02.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MK17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU03.02.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/32]HU03.02.2009
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/25]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE03.02.2014
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU03.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU03.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/07]NO17.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006080547  (AISIN AW CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract * * page 18, line 25 - line 27 * * page 24, line 2 - page 26, line 21 * * page 36, line 18 - line 30 * * page 37, line 25 - page 38, line 3 * [Y] 2-9,11,12,14,15,17-19;
 [X]EP0782118  (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - line 10 * * column 12, line 44 - line 50 * * column 13, line 32 - line 52 *;
 [XY]EP1711006  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] - [0051] , [0052] , [0070] , [0156] * [Y] 2-9,11,12,14,15,17-19;
 [XA]US2006244830  (DAVENPORT DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0032] , [0037] , [0057] * [A] 2-9,11,12,14,15,17-19;
 [X]  - JANSSEN H ET AL, "Vehicle surround sensing based on information fusion of monocular video and digital map", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 2004 IEEE PARMA, ITALY JUNE 14-17, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040614), ISBN 978-0-7803-8310-4, pages 244 - 249, XP010727476 [X] 1,13,16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2004.1336389
 [Y]  - SE S ET AL, "Vision-based mobile robot localization and mapping using scale-invariant features", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. ICRA 2001. SEOUL, KOREA, MAY 21 - 26, 2001; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010521), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-6576-6, pages 2051 - 2058, XP010550446 [Y] 12 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2001.932909
 [A]  - HEIMES F ET AL, "Automatic generation of intersection models from digital maps for vision-based driving on inner city intersections", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 2000. IV 2000. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE DEARBORN, MI, USA 3-5 OCT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20001003), ISBN 978-0-7803-6363-2, pages 498 - 503, XP010528986 [A] 1,13,16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2000.898392
by applicantWO2006080547
 EP0782118
 EP1711006
 US2006244830