Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2090800

EP2090800 - Coupling brake combination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 19.11.2014  [2014/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Herion Systemtechnik GmbH
Untere Talstrasse 65
71263 Weil der Stadt-Merklingen / DE
[2009/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Grötzinger, Lothar
Meisenweg 1
72172 Sulz
Neckar / DE
 [2009/34]
Representative(s)Sacht-Gorny, Gudrun
Jakelski & Althoff
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Mollenbachstrasse 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/43]Sacht-Gorny, Gudrun
Otte & Jakelski Patentanwaltskanzlei Mollenbachstraße 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
Former [2009/34]Sacht-Gorny, Gudrun
Otte & Jakelski Patentanwaltskanzlei Mollenbachstraße 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
Application number, filing date09001509.004.02.2009
[2009/34]
Priority number, dateDE2008100951615.02.2008         Original published format: DE102008009516
[2009/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2090800
Date:19.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2090800
Date:26.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/14, F16D67/02, F16D55/00, B30B15/10, B30B15/12, F16D67/04
[2009/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2010/17]
Former [2009/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kupplungs-Bremskombination[2009/34]
English:Coupling brake combination[2009/34]
French:Combinaison de freinage pour embrayage[2009/34]
Examination procedure10.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/12]
20.02.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
10.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2011Fee for grant paid
30.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Ortlinghaus-Werke GmbH
Kenkhauser Str. 125
D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  18.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Ortlinghaus-Werke GmbH
Kenkhauser Str. 125
D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Stenger, Watzke & Ring
Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/35]
Opponent(s)01  18.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Ortlinghaus-Werke GmbH
Kenkhauser Str. 125
D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Buse, Mentzel, Ludewig
Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
14.09.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/47]
02.07.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.07.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3013382  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * page 14, paragraph 1; figure - * [Y] 8;
 [XY]DE2711505  (ORTLINGHAUS WERKE GMBH) [X] 1-7,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 8;
 [XY]DE3424540  (WARNKE UMFORMTECH VEB K [DD]) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 23; figure . * [Y] 8;
 [XY]DE2549714  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8;
 [XY]DE2938359  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1,5-7,9,11,12 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 68; figure . * [Y] 8;
 [XY]DE2938394  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 8;
 [YA]DE10135663  (ORTLINGHAUS WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0035]; figure 2 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP1715212  (ORTLINGHAUS WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0314975
 DE19910965
 DE10135663